Global Patent Index - EP 1066783 A1

EP 1066783 A1 2001-01-10 - Set of letter boxes with means for complete opening

Title (en)

Set of letter boxes with means for complete opening

Title (de)

Briefkastenanlage mit Gesamtöffnung

Title (fr)

Bloc de boîtes aux lettres à ouverture totale

Publication

EP 1066783 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00202370 A

Priority

FR 9909057 A

Abstract (en)

Block of letterboxes has different columns of identical cells (3), and comprises technical department (5) on top of columns. Each cell comprises housing (9), door (11), and locking mechanism (13) having individual lock (15) and mobile bolt (17). Central locking of cells uses vertical rod (33) extending from technical department and through each individual cell. Shaft (25) in technical department is driven using electric actuator controlled by access control using magnetic key, etc.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un assemblage mécanique d'alvéoles (3) individuels identiques les uns aux autres, disposés les uns au-dessus des autres en au moins une colonne (350) d'alvéoles (3), chacun desdits alvéoles (3) comprenant un boîtier (9) fermé par un portillon (11) équipé d'un dispositif individuel (13) de fermeture et d'ouverture propre audit alvéole (3). Ledit assemblage comprend un dispositif centralisé de déverrouillage et verrouillage simultané de l'ensemble des portillons (11) desdits alvéoles, (3) quel que soit le nombre total desdits alvéoles (3). Application aux blocs (1) de boîtes aux lettres à ouverture totale pour immeubles. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 29/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 29/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 29/1201 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1066783 A1 20010110; FR 2795931 A1 20010112; FR 2795931 B1 20010907

INPADOC legal status


2004-11-03 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20040531

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030611

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010710

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI