Global Patent Index - EP 1066786 A1

EP 1066786 A1 2001-01-10 - Trigger device of a motion dependent operation and its use

Title (en)

Trigger device of a motion dependent operation and its use

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Auslösung eines wegabhängigen Vorgangs und deren Verwendung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de déclenchement d'un processus dépendant d'un déplacement et son utilisation

Publication

EP 1066786 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810589 A

Priority

EP 99810589 A

Abstract (en)

Operations in mechanical devices often have to take place with a certain time delay. To this end, rubber suction cups or bellows (1') are pressed together and the resulting vacuum is slowly compensated through a valve body (6) until atmospheric pressure is reached, at which point said suction cups or bellows are released from their contact surface (32) and trigger a mechanical operation. Reproducible and predetermined delay times can be obtained by installing selected sintered pins in the valve body (6), these also being able to switch the gear elements (35, 42) that are arranged on a rocker (31) in hand towel dispensers.

Abstract (de)

In mechanischen Geräten stellt sich oft die Aufgabe, Vorgänge zeitverzögert ablaufen zu lassen. Zu diesem Zweck werden Gummizapfen oder Faltenbälge (1') zusammengedrückt und das resultierende Vakuum über einen Ventilkörper (6) langsam zum Atmosphärendruck ausgeglichen, so dass sich diese von ihrer Kontaktfläche (32) lösen und einen mechanischen Vorgang schalten. Durch den Einbau von ausgewählten Sinterzapfen (9) im Ventilkörper (6) werden reproduzierbare und vorbestimmte Verzögerungszeiten erzielt, welche auch auf einer Wippe (31) angeordnete Getriebeelemente (35,42) in Handtuchspendern zu schalten vermögen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 10/36; F15B 21/10; G04F 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 10/28 (2006.01); A47K 10/36 (2006.01); G04F 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04F 3/00 (2013.01); A47K 10/28 (2013.01); A47K 10/36 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1066786 A1 20010110; AU 5385200 A 20010122; WO 0101838 A1 20010111

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031121

2001-11-28 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI NL

2001-10-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010702

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE GB IT LI NL

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI