Global Patent Index - EP 1066789 A1

EP 1066789 A1 2001-01-10 - Lifting device for the lower rack of a dishwasher

Title (en)

Lifting device for the lower rack of a dishwasher

Title (de)

Hebevorrichtung für den unteren Korb einer Geschirrspülmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de levage du panier inférieur d'un lave-vaisselle

Publication

EP 1066789 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00202106 A

Priority

IT MI991455 A

Abstract (en)

The invention has as an object a lifting device for the lower rack of a dishwasher. The device comprises two pairs of crossed levers (6-7) that are hinged to each other at a center line (8), suitable to extend in height above the closing door (30) of the dishwasher when this is open. The levers (6-7) have upper ends for the support of the lower rack (20) and lower ends that are controlled to be drawn near and apart from each other by at least one telescopic shaft (40) that is supported by the lower rack (20) and extends horizontally along the bottom wall (50) of the washing tub and that is controlled by motor means (42) that are positioned in proximity of the back wall (44) of the tub. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 15/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 15/506 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1066789 A1 20010110; EP 1066789 B1 20040414; DE 60009799 D1 20040519; DE 60009799 T2 20050421; IT 1313217 B1 20020617; IT MI991455 A1 20010102; IT MI991455 D0 19990701

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090615

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080625

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60009799 P 20040519

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020606

2001-12-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010710

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI