Global Patent Index - EP 1066812 A2

EP 1066812 A2 2001-01-10 - Lockable adapter for needle

Title (en)

Lockable adapter for needle

Title (de)

Arretierbarer Nadeladapter

Title (fr)

Adaptateur verrouillable pour aiguille

Publication

EP 1066812 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113838 A

Priority

DE 19930791 A

Abstract (en)

An arrangement for the reconstitution of a medicament, comprises a penetrating element and primary and secondary guide units located around the element. A third guide unit is located on the liquid container, and forms a guide path when joined to the secondary unit. An arrangement for the reconstitution of a medicament, comprises a penetrating element (18) and primary and secondary guide units (4,6) located around the element. The primary unit can be placed on the medicament container, while the secondary unit is placed on a fluid container (9). A third guide unit is located on the liquid container, and forms a guide path when joined to the secondary unit. In a first axial position the guide element can be arrested axially, so the penetrating member only passes through a membrane (46) and not the injection point (44). When in the second axial position, a flow path is created between the two containers.

Abstract (de)

Bei der erfindungsgemäßen Vorrichtung zur Rekonstitution von Medikamenten ist am Flüssigkeitsbehälter 9 eine Führungseinrichtung 36 vorgesehen, die beim Zusammenstecken mit der Führungseinrichtung 6 am Nadeladapter 2 eine Führungsanordnung bildet. Diese Führungsanordnung weist mindestens eine Führungsbahn 28',28'' und mindestens ein Führungselement 52',52'' auf, das in der Führungsbahn 28',28'' geführt werden kann. Führungselement 52',52'' und Führungsbahn 28',28'' sind derart gestaltet, daß der Nadeladapter 2 und der Flüssigkeitsbebälter 9 bis zu einer ersten Zusammensteckposition zusammengesteckt werden können, in der der Nadeladapter 2 axial arretiert ist. In dem derart arretierten Zustand des Nadeladapters 2 hat ein sich auf der Mittelachse des Nadeladapters 2 erstreckendes Durchstechelement 18 nur die Membran 46 und nicht die Injektionsstelle 44 des Flüssigkeitsbehälters 9 durchstoßen. Anschließend ist der Nadeladapter 2 in eine zweite axiale Zusammensteckposition überführbar, in der eine Strömungsverbindung zwischen dem Medikamentenbehälter und dem Flüssigkeitsbehälter 9 hergestellt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61J 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/00 (2006.01); A61J 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61J 1/2089 (2013.01); A61J 1/10 (2013.01); A61J 1/1475 (2013.01); A61J 1/201 (2015.05); A61J 1/2013 (2015.05); A61J 1/2055 (2015.05)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0195018 B1 19910605

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1066812 A2 20010110; EP 1066812 A3 20010314; EP 1066812 B1 20030305; AT 233531 T 20030315; DE 19930791 A1 20010111; DE 19930791 B4 20040212; ES 2191586 T3 20030916

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160523

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160610

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160606

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160609

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160608

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160606

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-06 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-10-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50001361

2013-10-17 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50001361

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FRESENIUS KABI DEUTSCHLAND G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-10-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1066812E

2003-09-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2191586 T3

2003-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-05 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001361 P 20030410

2003-04-02 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2003-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-05 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-05 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI