Global Patent Index - EP 1066855 A2

EP 1066855 A2 2001-01-10 - Descending device

Title (en)

Descending device

Title (de)

Abseilgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil de descente

Publication

EP 1066855 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890206 A

Priority

AT 114799 A

Abstract (en)

The device (1) has a roller axle for a rope (8) between two support parts (2,3) and a rope guide unit (7) with two annular, axially arranged guide parts (9',10') , which surround the axle and rotate relative to each other. Each guide part has a guide opening (121) for the rope in its outer wall. The guide openings are offset in the working or abseiling position, and are joined by rotating the guide parts to form a rope insertion position.

Abstract (de)

Abseilgerät (1) mit einer zwischen zwei Tragteilen (2, 3) gehaltenen Wickelachse für ein Seil (8) und mit einer Seilführungseinrichtung (7), welche zwei allgemein ringförmige, axial aneinander anliegende Führungsteile (9, 10; 9', 10') aufweist, die die Wickelachse (12) umgeben und relativ zueinander drehbar gelagert sind, und die je eine Führungsöffnung (21; 121, 221) für das Seil (8) in ihrer Ringwand (209; 120, 220) aufweisen, wobei die Führungsöffnungen (21; 121, 221) in der Betriebs- oder Abseilposition der Führungsteile (9, 10; 9', 10') voneinander getrennt vorliegen, in einer demgegenüber relativ zueinander verdrehten Position der Führungsteile (9, 10; 9', 10') zur Einführung oder Abnahme des Seils (8) jedoch miteinander in Verbindung stehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 1/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9717107 A1 19970515 - ROLLGLISS AG [CH], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1066855 A2 20010110; EP 1066855 A3 20010411; AT 409588 B 20020925; AT A114799 A 20020215

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011012

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI