Global patent index - EP 1066857 A1

EP 1066857 A1 2001-01-10 - Nitrogen extinguishing installation with storage tank

Title (en)

Nitrogen extinguishing installation with storage tank

Title (de)

Stickstoff-Löschanlage mit einem Bevorratungsbehälter

Title (fr)

Appareil d'extinction à azote avec réservoir de stockage

Publication

EP 1066857 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113003 A

Priority

EP 99113003 A

Abstract (en)

The nitrogen-discharging fire extinguisher (1) comprises a storage container with a valve (5) and a connected pipe conduit system (6) for nitrogen feed to extinguishing nozzles. The storage container is formed for storage of nitrogen in the liquified state. Storage takes place preferably at a pressure between 25 and 33 bar and at the corresponding liquifying temperature. The storage container (1) is formed by a metal tank, which has a cold insulation (3) and a cold unit (9,10) for compensation of the cold loss to the atmosphere.

Abstract (de)

Die Löschanlage enthält einen Stickstoff-Bevorratungsbehälter (1) mit einem Behälterventil (5) und einem an das letztere angeschlossenen Rohrleitungssystem (6) für die Zuführung des Stickstoffs zu entsprechenden Löschdüsen. Der Bevorratungsbehälter (1) ist zur Flüssiggaslagerung des Stickstoffs in gesättigtem Zustand ausgebildet und die Lagerung erfolgt einige Grad unterhalb des kritischen Punkts, vorzugsweise bei einem Druck im Bereich zwischen 25 und 33 bar und der entsprechenden Sättigungstemperatur. Der Bevorratungsbehälter (1) ist durch einen Metalltank (2) gebildet, welcher eine Kälteisolation (3) und ein Kälteaggregat (9, 10) zum Ausgleich des Kälteverlusts an die Umgebung aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 39/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 99/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 99/0018 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1066857 A1 20010110

INPADOC legal status

2013-07-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2008-02-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-11-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI