Global patent index - EP 1066864 A2

EP 1066864 A2 2001-01-10 - Game of skill

Title (en)

Game of skill

Title (de)

Geschicklichkeitsspiel

Title (fr)

Jeu d'adresse

Publication

EP 1066864 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99204092 A

Priority

NL 1012545 A

Abstract (en)

A game of skill comprising a betting table and a playing apparatus, the betting table being provided with a print with symbols on which chips, coins or like objects of value can be betted, the playing apparatus comprising a ball input tray having a concave surface which is rotational-symmetrical around a center with an opening at the location of the center of the surface, which opening opens into a passage which extends below the concave surface and terminates, via an outlet, into a circumferential area extending around the ball input tray, a circle of symbols subdivided into sections being located in the circumferential area, while at each section there is provided a symbol corresponding to a symbol on the betting table, the circle of symbols being rotatable relative to the passage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 5/00 (2013.01); A63F 7/0023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

NL 1012545 A1 19991221; NL 1012545 C1 20000310; EP 1066864 A2 20010110; EP 1066864 A3 20010919

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-07-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI