Global Patent Index - EP 1066865 A1

EP 1066865 A1 2001-01-10 - Assembly comprising a support rod and at least one table game figure, and table game provided with at least one such assembly

Title (en)

Assembly comprising a support rod and at least one table game figure, and table game provided with at least one such assembly

Title (de)

Aus einer Stützstange und mindestens einer Tischspielfigur bestehende Anordnung, und mit mindestens einer solchen Anordnung ausgerüstetes Tischspiel

Title (fr)

Ensemble comprenant une barre-support et au moins une figurine pour jeu de table et jeu de table pourvu d'au moins un tel ensemble

Publication

EP 1066865 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420149 A

Priority

FR 9909033 A

Abstract (en)

Bar (2) comprises series of lugs (4) attached using welding, one lug corresponding to each football character (6). Diameter of lug is slightly smaller than diameter of main part (3) of bar. Body-halves (A, B) represent front and back of football character, and comprise cavities (22 A, B) extending only for small part of width of character. When body-halves are joined together, lug is locked between cavities, hence securing character in rotation and in translation around bar. An Independent claim is also included for the game of table football.

Abstract (fr)

Dans cet ensemble, la barre comprend une partie principale (3) de section constante, notamment circulaire, et chaque figurine comprend une ouverture traversante définissant un volume de réception de la partie principale (3). La barre (2) est pourvue, dans une zone de réception de chaque figurine, d'un ergot (4) faisant saillie à partir de ladite partie principale (3) et chaque figurine comprend une cavité (22A, 22B) de réception et d'emprisonnement dudit ergot (4), ladite cavité débouchant dans ladite ouverture traversante mais ne débouchant pas sur des extrémités transversales de la figurine. La figurine possède une stabilité mécanique satisfaisante par rapport à la barre, aussi bien en rotation qu'en translation. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63F 7/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63F 7/0676 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1066865 A1 20010110; FR 2795972 A1 20010112; FR 2795972 B1 20010907

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-24 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030721

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-06-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GROUPE BERCHET

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI