Global Patent Index - EP 1066886 A2

EP 1066886 A2 2001-01-10 - Mail sorting system

Title (en)

Mail sorting system

Title (de)

Postsortiersystem

Title (fr)

Système de tri postal

Publication

EP 1066886 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00660122 A

Priority

FI 991532 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a mail sorting system and a method for handling mail matter, comprising a set of sorting compartments (1) consisting of one or more sorting compartments (2), an indicating means (11) arranged in each compartment (2) indicating the compartment, a control device (12) controlling the indicating means (11). The invention is characterized in that the mail sorting system and method are intended for sorting unaddressed mail matter in which address data is not readable on a mail piece, whereby the sorting data is arranged in the control means (12), and the mail sorting system and method are intended for collecting pre-sorted bundles (3) of mail matter according to delivery order from the compartments (2) of the set of sorting compartments (1), whereby the mail collecting order is arranged in the control device (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B07C 3/10; B07C 7/00; B07C 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B07C 3/00 (2006.01); B07C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B07C 7/005 (2013.01); B07C 3/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1066886 A2 20010110; EP 1066886 A3 20040616; EE 200000297 A 20010215; FI 991532 A 20010106; NO 20003446 A 20010108; NO 20003446 D0 20000703

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041217

2005-04-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-03-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-06-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-06-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 07C 3/10 A

2004-06-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 07C 7/02 B

2004-06-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 07C 7/00 B

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI