Global Patent Index - EP 1066890 A1

EP 1066890 A1 2001-01-10 - Arrangement for changing the nut securing a rolling ring

Title (en)

Arrangement for changing the nut securing a rolling ring

Title (de)

Anordnung zum Wechseln der einen Walzring haltenden Mutter

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour changer l'écrou de serrage d'une bague de laminage

Publication

EP 1066890 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99110883 A

Priority

EP 99110883 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0074869A1] The invention relates to an assembly provided with a changing device for changing the nut (11) which retains a roll ring and which is located on a roll shaft (2), said roll shaft being mounted in an unsupported manner and having a thread (13) for the nut (11). The changing device comprises a threaded bush (50) provided with a thread (12a) that corresponds with the thread (13) of the roll shaft (2) in order to receive the nut (11). The changing device also comprises a centering device (49) which ensures an aligned placement on the roll shaft (2). In order to enable the nut (11) to be screwed onto the roll shaft (2) from the threaded bush (50) in the instance that the positions of their threads do not exactly match one another, the threaded bush is configured such that is can be displaced or prevented from turning in relation to the centering device (49) and/or in relation to the roll shaft (2).

Abstract (de)

Anordnung zum Wechseln der einen Walzring haltenden Mutter (11) auf einer fliegend gelagerten, ein Gewinde (13) für die Mutter (11) aufweisenden Walzwelle (2) mittels einer Wechelsvorrichtung. Diese weist eine Gewindehülse (50) auf, die mit einem mit dem Gewinde (13) der Walzwelle (2) übereinstimmenden Gewinde (12a) versehen ist, um die Mutter (11) aufzunehmen. Sie weist eine Zentriereinrichtung (49) zum fluchtenden Ansetzen an die Walzwelle (2) auf. Damit die Mutter (11) auch dann von der Gewindehülse (50) auf die Walzwelle (2) aufgeschraubt werden kann, wenn deren Gewinde in ihrer Lage nicht genau aufeinander abgestimmt sind, ist die Gewindehülse im Verhältnis zu der Zentriereinrichtung (49) und/oder im Verhältnis zur Walzwelle (2) beweglich und drehgehemmt ausgebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 31/08; B21B 27/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 27/02 (2006.01); B21B 31/08 (2006.01); B25B 27/073 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 27/035 (2013.01); B21B 31/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0074869 A1 20001214; AT 231422 T 20030215; BR 0011350 A 20020528; CA 2375124 A1 20001214; CN 1368907 A 20020911; DE 59904093 D1 20030227; EP 1066890 A1 20010110; EP 1066890 B1 20030122; HK 1034217 A1 20030725; JP 2003501263 A 20030114; RU 2220798 C2 20040110; US 6286394 B1 20010911

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050607

2004-06-07 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040607

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031023

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KARK UWE

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-12-12 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-11-20 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031120

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030730

2003-07-23 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-07 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030607

2003-04-22 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904093 P 20030227

2003-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2003-01-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-22 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-22 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2003-01-22 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030122

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991221

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI