Global Patent Index - EP 1066913 A1

EP 1066913 A1 2001-01-10 - Method of manufacturing a blade for a cutting tool and product obtained thereby

Title (en)

Method of manufacturing a blade for a cutting tool and product obtained thereby

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Klinge eines Schneidwerkzeuges und damit hergestelltes Erzeugnis

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d' une lame pour un outil de coupe et produit ainsi obtenu

Publication

EP 1066913 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00111462 A

Priority

DE 19931948 A

Abstract (en)

Production of a blade of a cutting tool, especially a knife comprises laser treating the blade base material along a curve determined by the latter cutting edge, and molding the cutting edge of the blade along the curve within the laser treated region; or processing the blade base material by punching out or burring to form the latter cutting edge, laser treating the narrow side forming the latter cutting edge and grinding the cutting edge within the laser treated region.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Klinge eines Schneidwerkzeugs, insbesondere eines Messers. Um ein Verfahren zu schaffen, mit welchem gezielt auf die technologischen Materialeigenschaften der Klinge Einfluß genommen und ein Materialabplatzen vermieden als auch eine kostengünstige Herstellung ermöglicht werden soll, wird mit der Erfindung ein Verfahren vorgeschlagen, das dadurch gekennzeichnet ist, daß der Klingengrundwerkstoff (1) in einem ersten Verfahrensschritt entlang einer durch die spätere Schneide der Klinge bestimmten Kurvenkontur (2) laserbehandelt wird und in einem zweiten Verfahrensschritt die Schneide der Klinge entlang der durch die spätere Klingenform bestimmten Kurvenkontur (3) innerhalb des laserbehandelten Bereichs geformt, insbesondere zugeschnitten wird oder der Klingengrundwerkstoff in einem ersten Verfahrensschritt durch Ausstanzen oder Abgraten zur Formung der späteren Schneide bearbeitet wird, anschließend in einem zweiten Verfahrensschritt auf der die spätere Schneide bildenden Schmalseite die Laserbehandlung durchgeführt wird und schließlich in einem dritten Verfahrensschritt innerhalb des laserbehandelten Bereichs die Schneide geformt, insbesondere geschliffen wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23P 15/40; B26B 9/00; C21D 1/09; C21D 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23K 26/00 (2006.01); B23K 26/34 (2006.01); B23K 26/38 (2006.01); B23P 15/40 (2006.01); B26B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 9/00 (2013.01); B23P 15/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1066913 A1 20010110; EP 1066913 B1 20041103; EP 1066913 B9 20060315; CA 2313434 A1 20010109; DE 19931948 A1 20010118; DE 19931948 B4 20041111; ES 2232351 T3 20050601; JP 2001038534 A 20010213; US 6612204 B1 20030902

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070527

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070528

2008-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070528

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070527

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070527

2006-07-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060725

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060530

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060522

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-07-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2232351 T3

2005-03-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050208

2004-12-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008478 P 20041209

2004-11-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-11-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040109

2001-11-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE LI

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI