Global Patent Index - EP 1066935 A2

EP 1066935 A2 2001-01-10 - A machine for producing cork discs, particularly for composite stoppers

Title (en)

A machine for producing cork discs, particularly for composite stoppers

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Korkscheiben, insbesonder für Zusammengesetzter Stopfen

Title (fr)

Appareil pour la fabrication de disques de liège, en particulier pour de bouchons composite

Publication

EP 1066935 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00113533 A

Priority

IT TO990559 A

Abstract (en)

The machine comprises a stationary structure (10) and a rotary structure (12). One of these structures (10) has at least one driven, rotary, circular blade (18) and the other structure (12) comprises one or more supply ducts (76) in which a series of cork stoppers or other cylindrical cork elements progress in succession. Pincer means (88) are associated with the opening of the or each supply duct (76). The pincer means (88) are operated in synchronism with the rotation of the rotary structure (12) on each occasion in order to hold the first cylindrical element of the series whilst it is cut by the circular blade (18) and to release the element after the cutting has been performed and before the next cutting operation so that the portion of the cylindrical element which has not yet been cut progresses until it engages a support track for the cutting of a subsequent disc. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27J 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27J 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27J 5/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1066935 A2 20010110; EP 1066935 A3 20030305; IT 1308769 B1 20020110; IT TO990559 A1 20010102

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040819

2003-11-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030808

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI