Global Patent Index - EP 1066974 A1

EP 1066974 A1 2001-01-10 - Printing device having a printing ribbon spool including an information carrier for data related to the spool

Title (en)

Printing device having a printing ribbon spool including an information carrier for data related to the spool

Title (de)

Druckvorrichtung und Anordnung mit einer zum Drucken verwendbaren Spule und einem auf die Spule bezogenen Informationsträger

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'impression et ensemble associé d'un rouleau de consommable d'impression et d'un support d'informations relatives au rouleau

Publication

EP 1066974 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401965 A

Priority

FR 9908938 A

Abstract (en)

The roller has a data support (40) at the end, facing a reader (6). A locking pin (11) projects from the end of the roller housing to engage a recess (44) in the data support, fixing the data support relative to the housing. The roller has an elastic finger (32) that provisionally positions the data support by engaging in the recess (44) until pushed clear by the locking pin (11).

Abstract (fr)

Le dispositif comprend un logement (1) de réception du rouleau (20) rotatif et amovible de consommable d'impression, avec support (40) d'informations relatives au rouleau (20), des moyens de lecture (6) pour lire lesdites informations du support (40) et un doigt (11) de blocage en rotation du support d'informations en position de lecture, en saillie hors d'une paroi transversale (7) du logement (1) de réception du rouleau (20). Le support d'informations (40) ménage un évidement traversant (44), de réception du doigt de blocage en rotation (11), lui permettant d'être bloqué en rotation, en position de lecture. Le rouleau (20) supporte un ergot élastique (32), de solidarisation provisoire en rotation du rouleau (20) et du support d'informations (40), pouvant s'étendre dans l'évidement (44) et en être repoussé par le doigt de blocage (11) du dispositif. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 17/36; B41J 35/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 17/36 (2006.01); B41J 35/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 17/36 (2013.01); B41J 35/28 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2736864 A1 19970124 - SAGEM [FR]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1066974 A1 20010110; EP 1066974 B1 20051116; DE 60023994 D1 20051222; DE 60023994 T2 20060810; ES 2251949 T3 20060516; FR 2796002 A1 20010112; FR 2796002 B1 20010803

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150716

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150623

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150707

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-03-21 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAGEMCOM SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SAGEM TELECOMMUNICATIONS S. A., PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 60023994

- Effective date: 20130129

2012-03-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SAGEMCOM SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SAGEM SA, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 60023994

- Effective date: 20120120

2012-01-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60023994

2012-01-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60023994

- Representative's name: ,

2009-04-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090326 AND 20090401

2009-04-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090319 AND 20090325

2006-10-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060817

2006-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2251949 T3

2006-03-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060215

2005-12-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60023994 P 20051222

2005-11-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2005-11-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010705

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI