Global Patent Index - EP 1066989 A2

EP 1066989 A2 2001-01-10 - Pneumatic tyre

Title (en)

Pneumatic tyre

Title (de)

Luftreifen

Title (fr)

Bandage pneumatique

Publication

EP 1066989 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305706 A

Priority

  • JP 19364199 A
  • JP 20949299 A
  • JP 21393599 A

Abstract (en)

A pneumatic tyre comprises a belt (7) disposed radially outside a carcass (6) in a tread portion (2), the belt (7) comprising two crossed plies (7A,7B) of monofilament metallic cords (10A,10B,10C) laid at angles of from 15 to 30 degrees with respect to the circumferential direction of the tyre, each monofilament cord being composed of a waved single filament, the filament having a circular sectional shape having a diameter in a range of from 0.40 to 0.50 mm, or alternatively a non-circular sectional shape having an aspect ratio in a range of from 0.65 to 0.95 and a cross-sectional area in a range of 0.09 to 0.20 sq.mm. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60C 9/20; B60C 9/00; D07B 1/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60C 9/00 (2006.01); B60C 9/20 (2006.01); B60C 9/22 (2006.01); D07B 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D07B 7/025 (2013.01); B60C 9/0007 (2013.01); B60C 9/0057 (2013.01); B60C 9/0064 (2013.01); B60C 9/2009 (2013.01); B60C 9/22 (2013.01); D07B 1/0606 (2013.01); D07B 1/0646 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2003 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2005 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2007 (2013.01); D07B 2201/2008 (2013.01); D07B 2501/2046 (2013.01); Y10T 152/10765 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1066989 A2 20010110; EP 1066989 A3 20010912; EP 1066989 B1 20061115; DE 60031806 D1 20061228; DE 60031806 T2 20070920; DE 60043552 D1 20100128; EP 1712376 A2 20061018; EP 1712376 A3 20070221; EP 1712376 B1 20091216; US 2003047265 A1 20030313; US 6520232 B1 20030218; US 7063116 B2 20060620

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170613

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150706

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150706

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140702

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-10-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070817

2007-05-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60031806 P 20061228

2006-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-11-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-07-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050602

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-05-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020305

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 60C 9/20 A, 7D 07B 1/06 B, 7B 60C 9/00 B, 7B 60C 9/22 B

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI