Global Patent Index - EP 1067004 A1

EP 1067004 A1 2001-01-10 - Arrangement for fastening a fluid tank in a motor vehicle

Title (en)

Arrangement for fastening a fluid tank in a motor vehicle

Title (de)

Anordnung zum Befestigen eines Flüssigkeitsbehälters in ein Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation d'un réservoir de fluide dans un véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1067004 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401914 A

Priority

FR 9908871 A

Abstract (en)

The method of mounting a fluid reservoir in a motor vehicle dashboard involves providing a reservoir of defined shape (RES) and a dashboard with a matching recess (1). The reservoir is placed in the recess and fixed in its seating. There can be sliding guides (2,20) for the reservoir in the dashboard. The sliding guides can be a rib (2) and a matching groove.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne une fixation d'un réservoir de fluide, notamment d'un équipement de véhicule automobile, sur une partie du véhicule prévue à cet effet. Selon l'invention, ce réservoir (RES) est fixé sur le module de face avant du véhicule. Il est prévu alors un logement homologue (1) du réservoir (RES) dans le module (MFA), dans lequel le réservoir est introduit, puis fixé préférentiellement par encliquetage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60K 11/02; F01P 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60K 11/02 (2006.01); F01P 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B60K 11/02 (2013.01); F01P 11/029 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DE 19520870 A1 19961212 - BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]
  • [A] EP 0908375 A1 19990414 - PEUGEOT [FR], et al
  • [X] BAUER D: "MODULTECHNIK IN DER MOTORKUEHLUNG", ATZ AUTOMOBILTECHNISCHE ZEITSCHRIFT,DE,FRANCKH'SCHE VERLAGSHANDLUNG. STUTTGART, vol. 95, no. 9, 1 September 1993 (1993-09-01), pages 1 - 3, XP000390502, ISSN: 0001-2785

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067004 A1 20010110; BR 0002551 A 20010313; FR 2796009 A1 20010112; FR 2796009 B1 20010921; US 6474727 B1 20021105

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040323

2003-01-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021126

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010702

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI