Global Patent Index - EP 1067036 A1

EP 1067036 A1 2001-01-10 - Communication and control system for railbound vehicles

Title (en)

Communication and control system for railbound vehicles

Title (de)

Kommunikations- und Steuerungsanlage für Schienenfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Système de communication et de commande pour véhicules ferroviaires

Publication

EP 1067036 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00250224 A

Priority

SE 9902577 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a communication and control system for rail bound vehicles with one communication link called train bus (1), for transfer of information to and from the vehicles in a train, and at least one vehicle bus (2), for transfer of information within a vehicle or fixed set of vehicles. The vehicle bus works as a subsystem to the train bus and connects a number of functional units (5-9) in series. The vehicle bus comprises at least two segments (2a, 2b). In normal operation the segments work as a single communication link, but if a fault occurs the segment with the fault is disconnected, and the functional units connected to the disconnected segment take on a predetermined mode. <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61L 15/00; G06F 11/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61L 15/00 (2006.01); G06F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61L 15/0036 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067036 A1 20010110; SE 513763 C2 20001030; SE 9902577 D0 19990706; SE 9902577 L 20001030

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050301

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BOMBARDIER TRANSPORTATION GMBH

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI