Global Patent Index - EP 1067050 A2

EP 1067050 A2 2001-01-10 - Process and apparatus for manufacturing (folding) boxes

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for manufacturing (folding) boxes

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von (Falt-) Kartons

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication de boîtes (pliantes)

Publication

EP 1067050 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113625 A

Priority

DE 19931946 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves transporting cartons (10) for sealing along a vertical sealing conveyor (21). The cartons are tested for correct forming, especially correct forming of the glued seal. Correctly formed cartons are transferred at the end of the sealing conveyor in the area of a delivery station (33) to a horizontal discharge conveyor (22). Failed cartons are removed by bypassing them to the area of a discharge station for failed cartons. An Independent claim is included for a device for manufacturing or sealing the cartons.

Abstract (de)

Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von (Falt-)Kartons bzw. zum Verschließen derselben durch Anbringen von Klebestreifen (13) an Faltlappen (11) während einer Aufwärtsbewegung der Kartons (10) durch einen Schließförderer (21), wobei die verschlossenen Kartons (10) im Bereich einer oberen Übergabestation (33) an einen Abförderer (22) übergeben und vorher durch Überwachung festgestellte Fehlkartons (43) an dem Abförderer (22) vorbei förderbar sind in den Bereich einer Übergabestation für derartige Fehlkartons (43). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 51/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/26 (2006.01); B65B 7/16 (2006.01); B65B 51/06 (2006.01); B65B 57/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 51/06 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067050 A2 20010110; EP 1067050 A3 20050629; EP 1067050 B1 20080213; BR 0002649 A 20010313; BR 0002649 B1 20100615; CN 1198747 C 20050427; CN 1280092 A 20010117; DE 19931946 A1 20010111; DE 50014956 D1 20080327; JP 2001055208 A 20010227; JP 4361196 B2 20091111; US 6477819 B1 20021112

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-01-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150628

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50014956

2015-05-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140628

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150227

2015-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140628

2015-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-01-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150101

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140627

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140620

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130624

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130608

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130612

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130626

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081114

2008-10-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2008-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2008-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014956 P 20080327

2008-03-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080228

2008-02-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2008-02-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20060914

2006-03-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2005-11-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20050920

2005-06-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-06-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI