Global Patent Index - EP 1067056 A1

EP 1067056 A1 2001-01-10 - Pallet for storing and transporting goods

Title (en)

Pallet for storing and transporting goods

Title (de)

Palette zum Lagern und Transportieren von Gütern

Title (fr)

Palette destiné au stockage et au transport de marchandises

Publication

EP 1067056 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99113587 A

Priority

EP 99113587 A

Abstract (en)

A pallet particularly for storing and transporting goods, characterized in that it comprises a metallic grid-like platform (11) provided with legs (12) in a downward region. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/0095 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00024 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00059 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00064 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00069 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00094 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00273 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00293 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00298 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00323 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00333 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00373 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00557 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00562 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00572 (2013.01); B65D 2519/00835 (2013.01); B65D 2519/0086 (2013.01); B65D 2519/0099 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067056 A1 20010110

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030908

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030224

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI