Global Patent Index - EP 1067073 A2

EP 1067073 A2 2001-01-10 - Apparatus for separating adjacently transported strips, particularly metal strips

Title (en)

Apparatus for separating adjacently transported strips, particularly metal strips

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Separieren von nebeneinander liegend geförderten, insbesondere aus Metall bestehenden Streifen

Title (fr)

Appareil pour la séparation de rubans juxtaposés, en cours de transport, en particulier des rubans métalliques

Publication

EP 1067073 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00112007 A

Priority

DE 19931172 A

Abstract (en)

The apparatus for separating, in particular, metal strips (S1, ...), transported lying side by side comprises at least one separating unit (23, 24) which sequentially grips the front ends of the strips and moves them in a direction subs-tantially perpendicular to the transport direction (F) into positions in which there are gaps between adjacent strips.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum Separieren von nebeneinander liegend geförderten, insbesondere aus Metall bestehenden Streifen (S1) mit mindestens einer Vereinzelungseinheit (23), welche die Streifen (S1) sequentiell nacheinander im Bereich ihres der Vereinzelungseinheit (23) zugeordneten Anfangs ergreift und in einer Bewegung, die im wesentlichen quer zur Förderrichtung (F) der Streifen (S1) gerichtet ist, in eine von dem jeweils nächstbenachbarten Streifen (S1) separierte Position bringt, in welcher ein Abstand zwischen dem jeweiligen Streifen (S1) und den ihm jeweils nächst benachbarten Streifen (S1) besteht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/28; B65H 35/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/00 (2006.01); B21C 47/34 (2006.01); B65H 19/22 (2006.01); B65H 23/02 (2006.01); B65H 35/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 19/22 (2013.01); B21C 47/006 (2013.01); B21C 47/34 (2013.01); B65H 23/02 (2013.01); B65H 35/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19931172 C1 20010104; EP 1067073 A2 20010110; EP 1067073 A3 20020710; EP 1067073 B1 20040331

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20080521

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SUNDWIG G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-08-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070822

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070101

2007-02-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2007-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070101

2006-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060603

2006-06-02 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060602

2005-07-13 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050713

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-06-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050628

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-06-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050628

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-06-08 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050608

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050104

2004-12-01 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-07-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50005855

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FI NL SE

2003-04-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): BE DE FI NL SE

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020716

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 65H 19/28 A, 7B 65H 35/02 B, 7B 21C 47/00 B, 7B 65H 23/02 B

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI