Global Patent Index - EP 1067080 A2

EP 1067080 A2 2001-01-10 - Core

Title (en)

Core

Title (de)

Hülse

Title (fr)

Tube

Publication

EP 1067080 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00110860 A

Priority

DE 19931221 A

Abstract (en)

A tube, e.g. a conical yarn tube (40,50,60), is wound from several layers of material. The material is cut so that the ends of each layer form a butt join (41,51 61) and the location of the join is staggered uniformly round the circumference from layer to layer. The ends at the joins can be rectangular or tapered. The manufacturing process involves the steps of applying adhesive to the cut material, except for the innermost and outermost layer, winding or placing in a staggered formation, and finishing the ends and surface of the tube. Equipment can be adapted to feed material from a roll or from a stack of cut sections.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer Hülse (40, 50), insbesondere Garnspule, die aus mehreren Materiallagen gewickelt ist, wobei die Enden jeder gewickelten Lage stumpf aneinanderstoßen und die Stoßstellen (41, 51) der einzelnen Lagenversetzt zueinander angeordnet sind. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 75/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31C 1/00 (2006.01); B31C 7/00 (2006.01); B65H 75/10 (2006.01); B65H 75/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31C 7/00 (2013.01); B31C 1/00 (2013.01); B65H 75/10 (2013.01); B65H 75/50 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067080 A2 20010110; EP 1067080 A3 20020710; DE 19931221 A1 20010111

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031010

2003-07-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-04-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-07-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 65H 75/50 A, 7B 31C 7/02 B, 7B 31C 1/00 B, 7B 65H 75/10 B

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI