Global Patent Index - EP 1067084 A8

EP 1067084 A8 2001-03-14 - Device and method for avoiding vertical slippage and oscillations in load pick up means of conveyor facilities

Title (en)

Device and method for avoiding vertical slippage and oscillations in load pick up means of conveyor facilities

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Verhinderung von Vertikalverschiebungen und Vertikalschwingungen an Lastaufnahmemitteln von Vertikalförderanlagen

Title (fr)

Dispositif et méthode pour éviter les glissements et les oscillations verticales sur des appareils de prise de charge pour des installations de transport vertical

Publication

EP 1067084 A8 (DE)

Application

EP 00112866 A

Priority

  • EP 00112866 A
  • EP 99810561 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1067084A1] A braking appliance (1) positioned on the load-suspension device (24) holds the load-suspension device fast by means of frictional engagement on its guide rails (2) while the load suspension device is at a standstill; and overrides the frictional engagement by means of a corresponding command. The load-suspension device is raised by elastic supports (27). The braking appliance contains sensors (8) for detecting the vertically directed brake holding loads.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 17/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/30 (2006.01); B66B 1/00 (2006.01); B66B 1/06 (2006.01); B66B 5/00 (2006.01); B66B 11/02 (2006.01); B66B 11/08 (2006.01); B66B 17/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 17/34 (2013.01); B66B 11/0293 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067084 A1 20010110; EP 1067084 A8 20010314; EP 1067084 B1 20041208; AR 024471 A1 20021002; AT 284365 T 20041215; AU 4264900 A 20010104; AU 765263 B2 20030911; BR 0002873 A 20010130; CA 2312595 A1 20001225; CA 2312595 C 20071218; CN 1157323 C 20040714; CN 1279208 A 20010110; DE 50008884 D1 20050113; DK 1067084 T3 20050321; ES 2233245 T3 20050616; HK 1034237 A1 20050603; IL 136785 A 20031123; IL 136785 D0 20010614; JP 2001019292 A 20010123; KR 100720882 B1 20070522; KR 20010007506 A 20010126; MX PA00006285 A 20020308; NZ 505401 A 20011130; PT 1067084 E 20050429; SG 85192 A1 20011219; TW 553884 B 20030921; US 6318505 B1 20011120; ZA 200003091 B 20010117

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160619

2017-04-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170109

2017-03-22 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2017-03-02 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20050400531

- Effective date: 20170109

2017-01-23 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160616

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160621

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-08-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20150611

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20150624

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-10-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-19 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050619

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2233245 T3

2005-06-03 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1034237

2005-04-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20050225

2005-03-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-03-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050400531

2005-03-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-02-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050202

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008884 P 20050113

2005-01-12 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010618

2001-03-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DE ANGELIS, CLAUDIO, DIPL.-ING.

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI