Global patent index - EP 1067090 A1

EP 1067090 A1 2001-01-10 - Method for manufacturing of spring mattress core

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing of spring mattress core

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Matratzenfederkerns

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'une armature de matelas à ressorts

Publication

EP 1067090 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401798 A

Priority

FR 9908462 A

Abstract (en)

The manufacturing system for the mattress uses conveyor belts below and above the mattress (1), pushing bottom (3) and top (4) fabric or plastics layers together. The layers are unwound from reels (3a,4a). Springs (2) are provided by a conveyer system and are compressed as the two layers are forced together between pairs of guide rollers. Compressed air may be blown through an array of apertures in plates to force the two layers together at points (6) between the springs. The two layers are fastened together at these points. The two layers are fastened together all along the edges (5) of the mattress. After the fastening together of the layers, the conveyor belts diverge and the springs are allowed to relax.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé de fabrication d'une armature de matelas à ressorts. L'armature (1) comporte une pluralité de ressorts hélicoïdaux (2) disposés verticalement côte à côte en rangées et colonnes entre deux laizes (3, 4) de recouvrement en tissu souple s'appuyant sur les extrémités des ressorts (2). Les deux laizes (3, 4) sont assemblées entre elles le long de leur pourtour (5) et au voisinage de leurs zones ponctuelles (6) situées en vis-à-vis à la fois entre les rangées et les colonnes de ressorts. De préférence, les deux laizes sont reliées entre elles sensiblement dans le plan médian des ressorts par des lignes de liaison (7) entourant chacune un ressort (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B68G 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B68G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B68G 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 1475098 A 19670331 - UNITED STATES BEDDING CO, et al

Citation (search report)

[A] WO 9105732 A1 19910502 - SLUMBERLAND PLC [GB]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067090 A1 20010110; FR 2795712 A1 20010105; FR 2795712 B1 20010921

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040817

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030509

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI