Global Patent Index - EP 1067169 A1

EP 1067169 A1 2001-01-10 - Use of polymers as anti-misting additive in waterbased coolant lubricants

Title (en)

Use of polymers as anti-misting additive in waterbased coolant lubricants

Title (de)

Verwendung von Polymeren als Anti-Nebel-Additiv in wasserbasierenden Kühlschmierstoffen

Title (fr)

Utilisation de polymères comme additifs anti-embruns dans les lubrifiants aqueux de refroidissement

Publication

EP 1067169 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00113202 A

Priority

DE 19931219 A

Abstract (en)

The use of anti-misting agents in water-based cooling lubricants of 0.01-2 wt.% of copolymers containing units derived from N-vinyl acyl compounds and units derived from acrylamido sulfonic acids is new Use is claimed as anti-misting agents in water-based cooling lubricants of 0.01-2 wt.% of copolymers containing units derived from N-vinyl acyl compounds of formula (I) and units derived from acrylamido sulfonic acids of formula (II) R<1> and R<2> = H or 1-4C alkyl or form a 5-8-membered ring containing the N-CO group as well as other heteroatoms; R<3> = H or 1-4C alkyl; R<4> = 1-6C alkylene; and Y = alkali metal or ammonium

Abstract (de)

Verwendung von Copolymeren, welche Struktureinheiten enthalten, die sich aus den Verbindungen der Formeln 1 und 2 ableiten <IMAGE> worin R<1> und R<2>: H, C1-C4-Alkyl oder unter Einschluß der N-CO-Gruppe einen Ring von 5, 6, 7 oder 8 Ringatomen bilden, der neben der N-CO-Gruppe weitere Heteroatome umfassen kann, R<3>: H oder C1-C4-Alkyl, R<4>: einen verzweigten oder unverzweigten C1-C6-Alkylenrest und; Y: ein Alkalimetall oder Ammonium bedeuten, in Mengen von 0,01 bis 2 Gew.-% zur Verhinderung der Nebelbildung in wasserbasierenden Kühlschmierstoffen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 173/00; C10M 151/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08F 220/58 (2006.01); C08F 226/02 (2006.01); C08F 226/06 (2006.01); C08F 246/00 (2006.01); C10M 149/04 (2006.01); C10M 149/06 (2006.01); C10M 149/10 (2006.01); C10M 151/02 (2006.01); C10M 173/00 (2006.01); C10N 10/02 (2006.01); C10N 20/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/00 (2006.01); C10N 40/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 173/00 (2013.01); C10M 2201/02 (2013.01); C10M 2207/18 (2013.01); C10M 2209/08 (2013.01); C10M 2209/107 (2013.01); C10M 2215/042 (2013.01); C10M 2215/12 (2013.01); C10M 2215/222 (2013.01); C10M 2217/022 (2013.01); C10M 2217/024 (2013.01); C10M 2217/028 (2013.01); C10M 2221/02 (2013.01); C10M 2229/045 (2013.01); C10M 2229/046 (2013.01); C10M 2229/047 (2013.01); C10M 2229/048 (2013.01); C10N 2240/401 (2013.01); C10N 2250/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C10M 173/00 + C10M 151/02 + C10M 149/04 + C10M 149/06 + C10M 149/10 + C10M 145/10

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067169 A1 20010110; EP 1067169 B1 20060823; CA 2313568 A1 20010106; DE 19931219 A1 20010118; DE 19931219 C2 20010607; DE 50013346 D1 20061005; ES 2270761 T3 20070416; JP 2001059096 A 20010306; US 6462000 B1 20021008

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090621

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090622

2010-08-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090622

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090621

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090621

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080612

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080423

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080428

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080418

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20070630

2007-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070524

2007-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2270761 T3

2007-03-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-12-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061115

2006-10-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013346 P 20061005

2006-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2006-08-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060823

2006-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CLARIANT PRODUKTE (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010710

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI