Global Patent Index - EP 1067173 A1

EP 1067173 A1 2001-01-10 - Process for producing particles of amine reaction product

Title (en)

Process for producing particles of amine reaction product

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Amin-Umsetzungsprodukt-Teilchen

Title (fr)

Procédé de production de particules de produit de réaction d'amine

Publication

EP 1067173 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99870146 A

Priority

EP 99870146 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided a process for producing particles of amine reaction product by means of a carrier having a melting point of less than 30 DEG C, optionally followed by a coating step. Processed amine reaction products and finished compositions incorporating such processed product are also herein provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/00; C11D 3/20; C11D 3/22; C11D 3/30; C11D 3/33; C11D 3/37; C11D 3/50; C11D 17/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/26 (2006.01); A01N 25/00 (2006.01); A01N 25/12 (2006.01); A01N 25/26 (2006.01); A01N 35/02 (2006.01); A01N 35/10 (2006.01); A01N 37/18 (2006.01); A01N 37/50 (2006.01); A01N 43/90 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 221/00 (2006.01); C07C 225/14 (2006.01); C07C 249/02 (2006.01); C07C 251/18 (2006.01); C11B 9/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/50 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/06 (2013.01); C11D 3/507 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067173 A1 20010110; AU 5916000 A 20010130; JP 2003504350 A 20030204; MX PA02000337 A 20020621; WO 0104247 A1 20010118

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-14 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20060206

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030711

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010611

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI