Global Patent Index - EP 1067175 A1

EP 1067175 A1 2001-01-10 - Aqueous pearlescent concentrates

Title (en)

Aqueous pearlescent concentrates

Title (de)

Wässrige Perlglanzkonzentrate

Title (fr)

Concentrés aqueux nacrés

Publication

EP 1067175 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00113882 A

Priority

DE 19931998 A

Abstract (en)

New aqueous pearlizing concentrates comprise polyolcarboxylic acid esters, emulsifiers and polyols. Aqueous pearlizing concentrates are claimed, which comprise: (1) polyolcarboxylic acid esters (1-99.9 wt. %) obtained by reacting: (a) polyols containing 2-6 OH groups; (b) 1-22C fatty acids, 2-8C polyfunctional carboxylic acids; and (c) and 2-4C hydroxycarboxylic acids; (2) anionic, non-ionic, cationic, ampholytic and/or zwitterionic emulsifiers (0.1-99 wt. %); and (3) polyols (0-40 wt. %). An Independent claim is also included for preparation of the concentrates.

Abstract (de)

Es werden neue wäßrige Perlglanzkonzentrate vorgeschlagen, enthaltend - bezogen auf die Konzentrate - (a) 1 bis 99,9 Gew.-% Polyolcarbonsäureester, erhältlich durch Umsetzung von (I) Polyolen mit 2 bis 6 OH-Gruppen mit (II) linearen und/oder verzweigten, gesättigten und/oder ungesättigten Fettsäuren mit 1 bis 22 Kohlenstoffatomen und (III) polyfunktionellen Carbonsäuren mit 2 bis 8 und Hydroxycarbonsäuren mit 2 bis 4 Kohlenstoffatomen, (b) 0,1 bis 99 Gew.-% anionische, nichtionische, kationische, ampholytische und/oder zwitterionische Emulgatoren sowie, (c) 0 bis 40 Gew.-% Polyole, mit der Maßgabe, daß sich die Mengenangaben mit Wasser und weiteren Hilfs- und Zusatzstoffen zu 100 Gew.-% ergänzen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/20; A61K 7/075; C11D 1/66; C11D 1/825; C11D 1/83; C11D 1/835; C11D 1/94

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/825 (2006.01); C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 1/835 (2006.01); C11D 1/94 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0089 (2013.01); C11D 1/667 (2013.01); C11D 1/825 (2013.01); C11D 1/83 (2013.01); C11D 1/835 (2013.01); C11D 1/94 (2013.01); C11D 3/2093 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067175 A1 20010110; EP 1067175 B1 20040602; DE 19931998 A1 20010118; DE 19931998 C2 20021114; ES 2222138 T3 20050201

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160624

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160831

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-01-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-05-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050303

2005-02-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2222138 T3

2004-07-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50006663 P 20040708

2004-06-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2003-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030605

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: COGNIS DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000630

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI