Global Patent Index - EP 1067200 A1

EP 1067200 A1 2001-01-10 - Machine tool for continuously cutting sheet-like elements, particularly hides and the like

Title (en)

Machine tool for continuously cutting sheet-like elements, particularly hides and the like

Title (de)

Werkzeugmaschine zum kontinuierlichen Schneiden von blattförmigen elementen, insbesondere Häuten und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Machine-outil à découper en continu des éléments en forme de feuilles, en particulier des peaux et analogue

Publication

EP 1067200 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99112786 A

Priority

EP 99112786 A

Abstract (en)

A machine tool (1) for continuously cutting sheet-like elements, particularly hides and the like, comprising a surface (2) for supporting the sheet-like element to be cut provided with means for retaining the sheet-like element, further comprising means (10) for detecting the useful contour of the sheet-like element, means (10) for projecting the patterns to be cut on the sheet-like element, and cutting means (20) driven by an actuation unit which is controlled by means for controlling the positioning of the projected patterns. The cutting means (20) comprise at least two cutting heads (21,22) which act simultaneously and independently of each other. Each one of the cutting heads is movable in two mutually substantially perpendicular directions. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C14B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C14B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C14B 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067200 A1 20010110; BR 0002928 A 20010403

INPADOC legal status


2006-04-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050929

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030505

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI