Global Patent Index - EP 1067203 A1

EP 1067203 A1 2001-01-10 - Process of manufacturing iron-carbon-manganese alloy strips and strips obtained thereby

Title (en)

Process of manufacturing iron-carbon-manganese alloy strips and strips obtained thereby

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen von Eisen-Kohlenstoff-Mangan-Legierungbändern und also hergestellte Bändern

Title (fr)

"Procédé de fabrication de bandes en alliage fer-carbonne-manganese, et bandes ainsi produites"

Publication

EP 1067203 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401860 A

Priority

FR 9908758 A

Abstract (en)

1.5-10 mm-thick strip is cast from molten metal containing (in wt. %) C 0.001-1.6; Mn 6-30, Ni 10 and (Mn+Ni) 16-30; Si 2.5; Al 6; Cr 10; (P+Sn+Sb+As) 0.2; (S+Se+Te) 0.5; (V+Ti+Nb+B+Zr+rare earths) 0.3%; (Mo+W) 0.5%; N 0.3%; Cu 5%; and Fe and production impurities. After cold rolling to 10-90% reduction in one or more stages, recrystallization annealing is carried out. Preferably, the content of carbon in the molten metal is 0.2-0.8 wt.%. The strip is obtained by rolling between two closely located, horizontal cylinders which rotate in opposite directions and are internally cooled. Between the casting and rolling stages the strip is hot rolled to 10-60 % reduction in one or more stages, and between the casting and hot rolling stages the strip is passed through a non-oxidizing zone. Before the hot rolling stage the strip is subjected to decarbonization. The strip is coiled after casting or hot rolling and uncoiled before cold rolling. Acidic pickling of the strip is preferably carried out before cold rolling. Recrystallization annealing comprises a high density annealing process carried out at 900-1100 degrees C, immediately followed by cooling at a rate of 100-6000 degrees C/second. The strip is pickled after the annealing stage, followed by a skin-pass stage. An Independent claim is given for the an iron-carbon-manganese strip produced by the above process.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un procédé de production de bandes en alliage fer-carbone-manganèse, selon lequel : on coule sur une machine de coulée une bande mince d'épaisseur 1,5 à 10 mm directement à partir d'un métal liquide de composition en pourcentages pondéraux : C compris entre 0,001 et 1,6% ; Mn compris entre 6 et 30% ; Ni <= 10% avec (Mn + Ni) compris entre 16 et 30% ; Si <= 2,5% ; Al <= 6% ; Cr <= 10% ; (P + Sn + Sb + As) <= 0,2% ; (S + Se + Te) <= 0,5% ; (V + Ti + Nb + B + Zr + terres rares) <= 3% ; (Mo + W) <= 0,5% ; N <= 0,3% ; Cu <= 5%, le reste étant du fer et des impuretés résultant de l'élaboration ; on lamine à froid ladite bande à un taux de réduction compris entre 10 et 90% en une ou plusieurs étapes ; et on effectue un recuit de recristallisation de ladite bande. L'invention concerne également une bande susceptible d'être produite par ce procédé.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 8/02; C22C 38/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/06 (2006.01); B22D 11/12 (2006.01); C21D 8/02 (2006.01); C21D 9/46 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/04 (2006.01); C22C 38/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/0205 (2013.01); C22C 38/04 (2013.01); C21D 8/0215 (2013.01); C21D 8/0236 (2013.01); C21D 8/0273 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [AD] WO 9724467 A1 19970710 - PO HANG IRON & STEEL [KR], et al
  • [AD] WO 9526423 A1 19951005 - PO HANG IRON & STEEL [KR], et al
  • [AD] WO 9313233 A1 19930708 - PO HANG IRON & STEEL [KR], et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 375 (C - 0973) 12 August 1992 (1992-08-12)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 431 (C - 0759) 17 September 1990 (1990-09-17)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067203 A1 20010110; EP 1067203 B1 20040303; AT 260992 T 20040315; BR 0002544 A 20010313; CA 2314624 A1 20010107; CA 2314624 C 20090407; DE 60008641 D1 20040408; DE 60008641 T2 20050203; ES 2215008 T3 20041001; FR 2796083 A1 20010112; FR 2796083 B1 20010831; JP 2001049348 A 20010220; JP 2011068997 A 20110407; JP 4713709 B2 20110629; US 6358338 B1 20020319

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-10-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131030

2013-06-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120629

2013-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120629

2013-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120702

2013-04-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60008641

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-03-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-02-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120630

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120629

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120629

2013-02-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 260992 T

- Effective date: 20120629

2013-01-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-01-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130101

2012-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *USINOR

- Effective date: 20120630

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110715

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110622

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110624

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20110614

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110629

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110526

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110621

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110621

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-07-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110613

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2215008 T3

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-29 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040629

2004-06-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-06-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-06-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-05-04 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60008641 P 20040408

2004-04-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-03 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010113

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI