Global Patent Index - EP 1067225 A1

EP 1067225 A1 2001-01-10 - Method and device for attaching the warp leading ends to the drum of a sectional warper

Title (en)

Method and device for attaching the warp leading ends to the drum of a sectional warper

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Befestigen der Fadenscharanfänge auf der Trommel einer Konusschärmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour fixer les extrémités de chaîne sur le tambour d'un ourdissoir sectionnel

Publication

EP 1067225 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00109468 A

Priority

DE 19924585 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19924585C1] To attach the leading ends of a band of warps to the drum of a cone warping machine, an initial double-sided adhesive tape (13) is fitted into a longitudinal groove (12) along the length of the drum (2) cylinder. A second single-sided adhesive tape (14) is fitted at one free end to the first tape (13). When the leading end (7) of the first band of warps (4) is on the first adhesive tape (13), the second adhesive tape (14) is moved over the leading end (7) of the warps. As the leading ends of successive warps are put in place, the second adhesive tape (14) is fitted over them. The second adhesive tape (14) is wound on to a roll (15), to be unwound as the leading end (7) of each set of warps is positioned. An Independent claim is included for a cone warping machine with a longitudinal groove (12) in the drum to take an initial double-sided adhesive tape (13). As the leading ends (7) of the warps (4) are laid in place, a further single-sided adhesive tape (14) is drawn off a roll (15) to secure the warps in succession. A roll carrier (16) moves along the groove (12) with the drum (2). Preferred Features: The foot (18) of the roll carrier (16) is a part-rod, fitted into a holder at the drum cone. The roll carrier (16) is a one-piece bent plate component.

Abstract (de)

Ein Verfahren zum Befestigen der Fadenscharanfänge (7) an der Trommel (2) einer Konusschärmaschine (1) sieht vor, daß ein erstes, doppelseitiges Klebeband (13) über die Arbeitsbreite in eine Längsnut (12) des Trommelzylinders der Schärtrommel (2) gelegt wird. Ferner wird ein zweites, einseitiges Klebeband (14) mit seinem freien Ende am ersten Klebeband (13) fixiert. Nach dem Aufbringen des Anfangs (7) der ersten Fadenschar (4) wird das zweite Klebeband (14) über diesen Anfang (7) gelegt und jeweils nach Aufbringen des Anfangs (7) jeder Folgefadenschar wird das zweite Klebeband (14) über den jeweiligen Anfang (7) gelegt. Vorrichtungsmäßig kennzeichnet sich die Befestigungsvorrichtung durch eine Längsnut (12) in der Trommel (2), durch ein erstes doppelseitiges Klebeband (13) in der Längsnut (12), durch eine Rolle (15) aus einem zweiten doppelseitigen Klebeband (14) und durch einen Rollenträger (16), der entlang der Längsnut (12) verschiebbar ist und mit der Trommel (2) umläuft. Auf diese Weise läßt sich sowohl manuell als auch automatisch eine sichere Klebeverbindung zwischen den Fadenscharanfängen (7) und der Trommel (2) erzielen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02H 13/36; D02H 3/00; D02H 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 65/00 (2006.01); A44B 18/00 (2006.01); D02H 3/00 (2006.01); D02H 9/02 (2006.01); D02H 13/00 (2006.01); D02H 13/34 (2006.01); D02H 13/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02H 3/02 (2013.01); D02H 13/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19924585 C1 20001005; EP 1067225 A1 20010110; EP 1067225 B1 20030423; ES 2193022 T3 20031101; JP 2000336540 A 20001205; JP 3509697 B2 20040322

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070504

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070505

2008-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070505

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071201

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060516

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-05-08 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060508

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-04-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060428

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2193022 T3

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50001836 P 20030528

2003-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES IT LI

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001206

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES IT LI

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI