Global Patent Index - EP 1067227 B1

EP 1067227 B1 2002-09-18 - Fillingmaterial made of nonwoven fleece of mixed fibers

Title (en)

Fillingmaterial made of nonwoven fleece of mixed fibers

Title (de)

Füllmaterial aus Mischfaservlies

Title (fr)

matériau de rembourrage fait de tissu nno-tissé réalisé à partir d' un mélange fe fibres

Publication

EP 1067227 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113113 A

Priority

EP 99113113 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1067227A1] Filling material for cushions, etc., consists of a mixed fiber fleece of polyester fibers and cellulose fibers, the cellulose fibers being viscose fibers. In filling material for cushions, quilts, mattresses, mattress covers, sleeping bags etc., which consists of a mixed fiber fleece of polyester fibers and cellulose fibers, the cellulose fibers are viscose fibers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04H 1/04; D04H 1/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/04 (2012.01); D04H 1/42 (2012.01); D04H 1/425 (2012.01); D04H 1/4258 (2012.01); D04H 1/435 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/425 (2013.01); A47C 27/12 (2013.01); B68G 7/02 (2013.01); D04H 1/04 (2013.01); D04H 1/4258 (2013.01); D04H 1/435 (2013.01); D04H 1/4382 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067227 A1 20010110; EP 1067227 B1 20020918; DE 59902757 D1 20021024

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902757 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020318

2002-01-30 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FILLINGMATERIAL MADE OF NONWOVEN FLEECE OF MIXED FIBERS

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000414

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI