Global Patent Index - EP 1067238 A2

EP 1067238 A2 2001-01-10 - Multi-axial press fabric

Title (en)

Multi-axial press fabric

Title (de)

Multiaxiales Pressgewebe

Title (fr)

Tissu de presse multiaxial

Publication

EP 1067238 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00850126 A

Priority

US 35071199 A

Abstract (en)

A multi-axial press fabric includes a base fabric and several layers of staple fiber material attached to the base fabric by needling. The base fabric has at least one layer assembled by spirally winding a woven fabric strip. The base fabric takes the form of an endless loop. The yarns of the woven fabric strip accordingly lie in directions different from the machine- and cross-machine directions of the base fabric, giving the base fabric multi-axial characteristics. Individual fibers in the several layers of staple fiber material attached to the base fabric are predominantly oriented at oblique angles relative to the machine direction of the press fabric. More specifically, they form a crisscrossed angular web. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04H 1/45 (2006.01); D03D 3/04 (2006.01); D04H 5/08 (2006.01); D21F 3/00 (2006.01); D21F 3/02 (2006.01); D21F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 7/083 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067238 A2 20010110; EP 1067238 A3 20010502; AU 5951799 A 20010111; BR 0007879 A 20020205; CA 2313625 A1 20010109; CN 1280226 A 20010117; ID 26470 A 20010111; JP 2001040594 A 20010213; KR 20010012065 A 20010215; NO 20003501 A 20010110; NO 20003501 D0 20000707; NZ 501159 A 20010126; ZA 9907670 B 20000627

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030103

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010505

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI