Global Patent Index - EP 1067249 A2

EP 1067249 A2 2001-01-10 - A laid monolithic ceiling out of cement reinforced concrete and the relative process for realizing the same

Title (en)

A laid monolithic ceiling out of cement reinforced concrete and the relative process for realizing the same

Title (de)

Monolithische Ort gegossene Stahlbetondecke und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung

Title (fr)

Dalle monolithique en béton armé coulée sur place et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 1067249 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00202226 A

Priority

IT CR990007 A

Abstract (en)

A laid monolithic ceiling out of cement reinforced concrete comprising. extrados beams (2) that cooperate like a monolyth with a cast slab (1) in which they are partially inserted. The realization process of said laid comprises the following phases: the building of at least two carrying pillars; the realization of an intrados formwork supported by props; the formation of the iron reinforcing of the slab and of the extrados beams; the filling of the formworks with cement for the cast of the slab and of the portion of the extrados beams inserted into said slab; the realization of the formwork projecting from the extrados of the slab for the finishing cast of the extrados beams. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 7/02; E04B 5/43; E04C 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/32 (2006.01); E04B 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 5/32 (2013.01); E04B 7/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067249 A2 20010110; EP 1067249 A3 20010606; IT CR990007 A1 20010108; IT CR990007 D0 19990707

INPADOC legal status


2005-06-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20041214

2004-09-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040802

2002-02-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011127

2001-06-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 7/02 A, 7E 04B 5/43 B, 7E 04C 3/20 B, 7E 04B 5/32 B

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI