Global Patent Index - EP 1067252 A2

EP 1067252 A2 2001-01-10 - A process and means for laying tiles

Title (en)

A process and means for laying tiles

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verlegen von Fliesen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la pose des carreaux

Publication

EP 1067252 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00830427 A

Priority

  • IT MO990150 A
  • IT MO990029 U

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a process and a means for laying tiles which comprises placing the tiles (1) side by side and interpositioning tabs (2), each of which is inserted in two hollows (3) predisposed on two facing edges (10) of two adjacent tiles (1). The tab (2) fits snug with no play in the two hollows (3). Each hollow (3) is situated at a predetermined distance from the upper surface (11) of the relative tile (1). Each tab (2) is conformed in such a way as to exhibit an upper reference surface (21) predisposed to couple contactingly with corresponding reference surfaces (31) which superiorly delimit two single hollows (3) specially predisposed, one beside another, on two facing edges (10) of two tiles (2) reciprocally laid side-by-side. The reference surfaces (31) superiorly delimiting the single hollows (3) are situated at a predetermined distance which is equal for all the hollows (3) from the upper surfaces (11) of the relative tiles (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 13/08; E04F 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/08 (2006.01); E04F 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 13/08 (2013.01); E04F 15/02 (2013.01); E04F 2201/05 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067252 A2 20010110; EP 1067252 A3 20010530

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-29 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20030605

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010611

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04F 13/08 A, 7E 04F 15/02 B, 7F 16B 5/00 B

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI