Global Patent Index - EP 1067269 A1

EP 1067269 A1 2001-01-10 - Door, especially a fireproof door

Title (en)

Door, especially a fireproof door

Title (de)

Tür, insbesondere Feuerschutztür

Title (fr)

Porte, notamment une porte coupe-feu

Publication

EP 1067269 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113263 A

Priority

EP 99113263 A

Abstract (en)

The door (1) comprises a first sheet metal (3) flat box-shaped part (5) with a first base (7) and narrow-side wall strips (14) A second sheet metal part (4) in the form of a flat lid (9) and second base (16). A first covering strip (17) is attached to the base and is bent towards the first base. An adjoining second covering strip (18) is bent to the appropriate wall strip. Two strap hinge parts are positioned at the top and bottom of a lateral narrow side (12b). Frame-like edge-reinforcements (21) formed by extension strips (22) go round the door. Thermally insulating material is between the two sheet metal parts.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Tür (1), insbesondere Feuerschutztür, umfassend ein erstes Blechteil (3) in Form eines flachen Kastens (5), Randversteifungsmittel (21), ein mit dem ersten Blechteil (3) verbundenes zweites Blechteil (4) in Form eines auf den Kasten (5) passenden Deckels (9), rahmenartige Randversteifungsmittel (21) im Umfangsbereich der Tür (1) sowie ein dem Rahmen-Hohlraum (5a) zwischen den beiden Blechteilen (3, 4) angeordnetes Dämmaterial, insbesondere Wärme-Dämmaterial. Zwecks einfacher und kostengünstiger Herstellung bei Gewährleistung der Stabilität sind die Randversteifungsmittel (21) einstückig mit dem ersten und/oder dem zweiten Blechteil (3, 4) ausgebildet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/82; E06B 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/827 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067269 A1 20010110; EP 1067269 B1 20041013; DE 59910843 D1 20041118; ES 2230769 T3 20050501

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160711

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120709

2013-10-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131018

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120708

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130329

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110722

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-09-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2230769 T3

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59910843 P 20041118

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2003-05-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030331

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000719

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI