Global patent index - EP 1067278 A2

EP 1067278 A2 2001-01-10 - Catalyst canning structure and catalyst carrying method thereof

Title (en)

Catalyst canning structure and catalyst carrying method thereof

Title (de)

Anordnung eines Katalysators in einem Gehäuse sowie Methode zur Aufbringung einer katalytischen Beschichtung auf denselben

Title (fr)

Arrangement d'un catalyseur dans une boite ansi qu'un methode d'application d'une couche catalytique sur ledit catalyseur

Publication

EP 1067278 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305759 A

Priority

JP 19412599 A

Abstract (en)

A canning structure comprises a ceramic honeycomb structure (10) which is to be loaded with a catalyst, canned in a metal case (11) and being held by holding material (13). An impermeable film (60) is provided between the ceramic honeycomb structure and the holding material. To load a catalyst, a catalyst slurry is poured in only on the ceramic honeycomb structure side of the impermeable film, thereby preventing the holding material from carrying the catalyst. Thus, the holding material does not carry expensive catalyst. Chipping and cracking of the ceramic honeycomb structure can be prevented during transport, during loading of catalyst, during canning, and during handling. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 3/28; F01N 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 35/04 (2006.01); F01N 3/28 (2006.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/2853 (2013.01); B01J 35/04 (2013.01); F01N 2450/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067278 A2 20010110; EP 1067278 A3 20020814; EP 1067278 B1 20041013; CA 2313586 A1 20010108; CA 2313586 C 20050215; DE 60014782 D1 20041118; DE 60014782 T2 20060209; JP 2001017865 A 20010123; JP 4076677 B2 20080416

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050707

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-07-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050707

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60014782

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-11-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-10-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-05-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: CATALYST CANNING STRUCTURE AND CATALYST CARRYING METHOD THEREOF

2004-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031107

2003-05-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-02-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-08-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 01N 3/28 A, 7F 01N 7/18 B, 7B 01J 35/04 B

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI