Global patent index - EP 1067294 A2

EP 1067294 A2 2001-01-10 - Filter bypass for hydraulic systems

Title (en)

Filter bypass for hydraulic systems

Title (de)

Filterumleitung eines hydraulischen Systems

Title (fr)

Dérivation du filtre dans un système hydraulique

Publication

EP 1067294 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113963 A

Priority

DE 19932097 A

Abstract (en)

The system delivers a part of the pressurised fluid from the pump (7) directly to the consumer (8) below a previously defined temperature, independently of a pressure level in front of the filter unit. Above a determined pressure level, the supplied fluid is delivered through the filter unit to the consumer. A valve between the filter unit and the pump is operates a slider (2) through an element (1), whose volume changes with temperature, to connect the pump and the filter unit or the consumer.

Abstract (de)

Eine Pumpe fördert Druckflüssigkeit über ein Filterelement zu den Verbrauchern. Um bei kalter Druckflüssigkeit mit entsprechend höherer Viskosität das Filterelement zu schützen und zu gewährleisten, daß den Verbrauchern ausreichend Druckflüssigkeit zur Verfügung steht, wird unterhalb einer zuvor definierten Temperatur die Druckflüssigkeit direkt von der Pumpe und oberhalb einer zuvor definierten Temperatur die Druckflüssigkeit über das Filterelement zu den Verbrauchern geleitet. Hierzu wird über ein temperaturabhängiges Element (1) eine Verbindung von der Pumpe (6) zu den Verbrauchern (5) abhängig von der Temperatur geschaffen oder verschlossen. Damit dieser Vorgang unabhängig vom Druck zwischen der Pumpe und dem Filterelement ist, wird ein Schieber (2) beidseitig mit Druck von der Pumpe beaufschlagt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 21/045 (2013.01); F15B 21/041 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19539759 A1 19970430 - ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067294 A2 20010110; EP 1067294 A3 20030604; DE 19932097 A1 20010111

INPADOC legal status

2004-12-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040622

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI