Global Patent Index - EP 1067294 A3

EP 1067294 A3 2003-06-04 - Filter bypass for hydraulic systems

Title (en)

Filter bypass for hydraulic systems

Title (de)

Filterumleitung eines hydraulischen Systems

Title (fr)

Dérivation du filtre dans un système hydraulique

Publication

EP 1067294 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00113963 A

Priority

DE 19932097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1067294A2] The system delivers a part of the pressurised fluid from the pump (7) directly to the consumer (8) below a previously defined temperature, independently of a pressure level in front of the filter unit. Above a determined pressure level, the supplied fluid is delivered through the filter unit to the consumer. A valve between the filter unit and the pump is operates a slider (2) through an element (1), whose volume changes with temperature, to connect the pump and the filter unit or the consumer.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 21/045 (2013.01); F15B 21/041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067294 A2 20010110; EP 1067294 A3 20030604; DE 19932097 A1 20010111

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-29 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040622

2004-02-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2003-10-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030903

2003-07-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI