Global patent index - EP 1067296 A1

EP 1067296 A1 2001-01-10 - Electrohydraulic lifting module

Title (en)

Electrohydraulic lifting module

Title (de)

Elektrohydraulischer Hubmodul

Title (fr)

Module de levage électrohydraulique

Publication

EP 1067296 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112802 A

Priority

DE 29911686 U

Abstract (en)

The lifting module has an electric motor-driven supply pump (P) which can be operated in supply and energy-saving modes and which can be connected selectively to pressure supply lines (5,15) of at least one load (VH) for a main lifting function and at least one load (VN) for an auxiliary function. The auxiliary line (8) from the main function load via the pump to the tank is blocked in the reverse flow direction; the auxiliary function load can be operated even in the pump's energy-saving mode. There is only one supply pump and the auxiliary function load can be actuated in energy-saving mode with at least some of the pressure from the main function load via the auxiliary line and by the medium displaced by the supply pump.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem elektrohydraulischen Hubmodul (S) mit einer durch einen Motor (M) antreibbaren Pumpe (P), die in einem Versorgungsmodus und in einem Energiesparmodus betreibbar ist, und an die wahlweise Leitungen (5, 15) wenigstens eines Verbrauchers (VH) einer Haupthebefunktion und wenigstens eines Verbrauchers (VN) einer Nebenfunktion anschließbar sind, und bei dem ein in Rückströmrichtung zum Tank blockierter Nebenstrang (8) vom Verbraucher der Haupthebefunktion über die Pumpe (P) zu einer Verbindung (2) zum Tank verläuft und der Verbraucher der Nebenfunktion auch im Energiesparmodus betätigbar ist, ist nur eine einzige Versorgungspumpe (P) vorgesehen und wird der Verbraucher (VN) der Nebenfunktion im Energiesparmodus zumindest anteilig mit aus dem Verbraucher der Haupthebefunktion über den Nebenstrang (8) und durch die Pumpe (P) verdrängtem Druckmittel betätigt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 21/14; B66F 9/22; F15B 11/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/22 (2006.01); F15B 11/16 (2006.01); F15B 21/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/16 (2013.01); B66F 9/22 (2013.01); F15B 21/14 (2013.01); F15B 2211/20515 (2013.01); F15B 2211/2053 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30505 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30535 (2013.01); F15B 2211/40507 (2013.01); F15B 2211/40515 (2013.01); F15B 2211/40584 (2013.01); F15B 2211/4159 (2013.01); F15B 2211/426 (2013.01); F15B 2211/45 (2013.01); F15B 2211/46 (2013.01); F15B 2211/50518 (2013.01); F15B 2211/50527 (2013.01); F15B 2211/50563 (2013.01); F15B 2211/5151 (2013.01); F15B 2211/5154 (2013.01); F15B 2211/5158 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6054 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6055 (2013.01); F15B 2211/7142 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29911686 U1 19990916; EP 1067296 A1 20010110; EP 1067296 B1 20041229

INPADOC legal status

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50009076

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50009076

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130627

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-12-12 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20070615

2005-11-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: JUNGHEINRICH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20050929

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50009076

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-02-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031020

2003-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAWE HYDRAULIK GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI