Global Patent Index - EP 1067296 B1

EP 1067296 B1 2004-12-29 - Electrohydraulic lifting module

Title (en)

Electrohydraulic lifting module

Title (de)

Elektrohydraulischer Hubmodul

Title (fr)

Module de levage électrohydraulique

Publication

EP 1067296 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112802 A

Priority

DE 29911686 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1067296A1] The lifting module has an electric motor-driven supply pump (P) which can be operated in supply and energy-saving modes and which can be connected selectively to pressure supply lines (5,15) of at least one load (VH) for a main lifting function and at least one load (VN) for an auxiliary function. The auxiliary line (8) from the main function load via the pump to the tank is blocked in the reverse flow direction; the auxiliary function load can be operated even in the pump's energy-saving mode. There is only one supply pump and the auxiliary function load can be actuated in energy-saving mode with at least some of the pressure from the main function load via the auxiliary line and by the medium displaced by the supply pump.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 21/14; B66F 9/22; F15B 11/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 9/22 (2006.01); F15B 11/16 (2006.01); F15B 21/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 11/16 (2013.01); B66F 9/22 (2013.01); F15B 21/14 (2013.01); F15B 2211/20515 (2013.01); F15B 2211/2053 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30505 (2013.01); F15B 2211/30535 (2013.01); F15B 2211/40507 (2013.01); F15B 2211/40515 (2013.01); F15B 2211/40584 (2013.01); F15B 2211/4159 (2013.01); F15B 2211/426 (2013.01); F15B 2211/45 (2013.01); F15B 2211/46 (2013.01); F15B 2211/50518 (2013.01); F15B 2211/50527 (2013.01); F15B 2211/50563 (2013.01); F15B 2211/5151 (2013.01); F15B 2211/5154 (2013.01); F15B 2211/5158 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6054 (2013.01); F15B 2211/6055 (2013.01); F15B 2211/7142 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29911686 U1 19990916; EP 1067296 A1 20010110; EP 1067296 B1 20041229

INPADOC legal status


2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-04-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50009076

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50009076

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130627

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-12-12 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20070615

2005-11-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: JUNGHEINRICH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20050929

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009076 P 20050203

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2003-12-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031020

2003-06-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HAWE HYDRAULIK GMBH & CO. KG

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI