Global Patent Index - EP 1067330 A1

EP 1067330 A1 2001-01-10 - Vehicle headlight comprising improved means for locking the lamp

Title (en)

Vehicle headlight comprising improved means for locking the lamp

Title (de)

Kfz-Scheinwerfer mit verbesserter Lampenverriegelungseinrichtung

Title (fr)

Projecteur de véhicule automobile comportant des moyens perfectionnés de verrouillage de lampe

Publication

EP 1067330 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401852 A

Priority

FR 9908852 A

Abstract (en)

The headlamp has a hole (11) in the reflector (10) to allow fitting of the bulb (20) and a connector (30) block. The connector block has locking tongues (40,41a,41b) that engage in slots (12a,12b) in supports extending backward from the reflector. The connector block is rotated about a line extending the axis of the bulb to engage or release the lock.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un projecteur de véhicule automobile comprenant un réflecteur (10) muni d'un orifice (11) pour l'engagement d'une lampe (20) et un connecteur (30) branché sur la lampe pour relier par des conducteurs (32) la lampe à une alimentation électrique du véhicule, caractérisé en ce qu'il est prévu sur le connecteur (30) des moyens de verrouillage (40, 41a, 41b) pour coopérer avec des moyens (12a, 12b) correspondants du réflecteur pour fixer ledit connecteur sur le réflecteur, et assurer le maintien de la position de la lampe sur le réflecteur. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21W 101/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1113 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067330 A1 20010110; FR 2796128 A1 20010112; FR 2796128 B1 20010817

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20061109

2006-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21V 19/00 20060101AFI20060508BHEP

2006-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21W 101/10 20060101ALN20060508BHEP

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI