Global patent index - EP 1067340 A2

EP 1067340 A2 2001-01-10 - Replacing gas collecting trap for an air conditioner

Title (en)

Replacing gas collecting trap for an air conditioner

Title (de)

Falle für die Sammlung von Austauschungsgas in einer Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Piège pour recueillir le gaz de remplacement dans un dispositif de conditionnement d'air

Publication

EP 1067340 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00114304 A

Priority

JP 19002899 A

Abstract (en)

This invention relates to a replacing gas collecting trap apparatus used for installing an air conditioner, an outdoor unit includes a compressor and an outdoor unit heat exchanger and refrigerant gas is charged into both of the compressor and the outdoor unit exchanger, an indoor unit includes an indoor unit heat exchanger which is opened into atmosphere, and a connecting pipe connecting the outdoor unit and the indoor unit, that is comprised of: a trap container body; a gas trap agent charged in said trap container for absorbing and collecting a replacing gas which has replaced air in said indoor unit heat exchanger and said connecting pipe through a connecting apparatus, wherein a volume of space inside said trap container is larger than the volume of inner space of said connecting apparatus. By this configuration, when the collecting trap apparatus is connected to the refrigeration cycle, by the volume of the space of negative pressure inside the apparatus, the air inside the connecting apparatus and the replacing gas contained in the connecting pipes are inhaled at one go to the collecting trap apparatus, then collected to the gas trap agent by physical absorption or chemical reaction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 43/04 (2006.01); F25B 45/00 (2006.01); F25B 13/00 (2006.01); F25B 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 45/00 (2013.01); F25B 13/00 (2013.01); F25B 41/003 (2013.01); F25B 43/04 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067340 A2 20010110; EP 1067340 A3 20010704; EP 1067340 B1 20050928; DE 60022831 D1 20060209; DE 60022831 T2 20060511; ES 2247986 T3 20060316; JP 2001021239 A 20010126; JP 3149871 B2 20010326; MY 125784 A 20060830

INPADOC legal status

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2013-08-23 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130823

2012-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110704

2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60022831

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100630

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-10-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100722

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2247986

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60022831

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-02-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2004-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040319

2002-03-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES IT

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010823

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-07-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 24F 1/02 A, 7F 25B 41/00 B, 7F 25B 45/00 B

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES IT

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI