Global Patent Index - EP 1067343 A2

EP 1067343 A2 2001-01-10 - Pressure-compensating valve for refrigerating chambers

Title (en)

Pressure-compensating valve for refrigerating chambers

Title (de)

Druckausgleichendes Ventil für Kühlräume

Title (fr)

Vanne d'équilibrage de pression pour chambres froides

Publication

EP 1067343 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00500148 A

Priority

ES 9901512 A

Abstract (en)

This valve consists of two ventilators (1 and 2), each of which is driven by an independent motor (la and 2a), the motors being of equal power, an electric control circuit (3), some LED's (4) indicating the operational status of the ventilators (1 and 2), a heating element (5) for heating the valve unit, a pipe (6) to channel the flow of air produced by the ventilators (1 and 2) and two grates at each end (7 and 8). The pipe (6) is mounted in an opening made in a wall (9) of the refrigerating chamber and has the grates (7 and 8) at each end. The ventilators (1 and 2) are mounted by means of a housing (10) inside the pipe (6), and each one projects a flow of air (1b and 2b) towards the interior and the exterior of the refrigerating chamber respectively. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 17/00; F04D 25/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/12 (2006.01); F04D 25/16 (2006.01); F25D 17/04 (2006.01); F25D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/12 (2013.01); F04D 25/166 (2013.01); F25D 17/047 (2013.01); F25D 17/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067343 A2 20010110; EP 1067343 A3 20020814; ES 2160502 A1 20011101; ES 2160502 B1 20020601

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060201

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040402

2003-05-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20021026

- Countries: AL

2003-05-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20021026

- Countries: LT

2003-05-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20021026

- Countries: LV

2003-05-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20021026

- Countries: MK

2003-05-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20021026

- Countries: RO

2003-05-07 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20021026

- Countries: SI

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021018

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI