Global Patent Index - EP 1067351 A2

EP 1067351 A2 2001-01-10 - Radiator

Title (en)

Radiator

Title (de)

Heizkörper

Title (fr)

Radiateur

Publication

EP 1067351 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00500084 A

Priority

ES 9901526 A

Abstract (en)

The radiator components are made as one in a compact vertical half-cylinder. The radiator comprises an exterior half-cylindrical shell (2) containing pipes carrying a heating fluid, and a number of fins which are intended to increase the surface area available for heat exchange. The shell, the pipes and the fins are made in a single piece with the pipe being a single straight conduit passing vertically through the structure. The radiator (1) includes a lower base region (3) which encloses the control valve gear, the pipe access points and the connections. The radiator is intended to be mounted flat on a wall, or in a quarter-cylindrical configuration may be mounted in the corner between two walls.

Abstract (fr)

Il comprend une carcasse extérieure (2), des moyens de conduction d'un fluide de chauffage et une pluralité d'ailettes (7) destinées à augmenter la surface d'échange de chaleur et il est caractérisé en ce que ladite carcasse (2), lesdits moyens de conduction et lesdites ailettes (7) sont d'une seule pièce, les moyens de conduction du fluide de chauffage étant un conduit rectiligne unique (6) disposé dans le sens sensiblement vertical, le radiateur (1) comprenant un pan inférieur (3), qui couvre toute la vannerie et les conduits dans leur connexion avec celle-ci. Le radiateur (1) occupe un espace réduit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28D 1/053; F28F 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28D 1/0233 (2013.01); F28F 1/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE ES FR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067351 A2 20010110; EP 1067351 A3 20020828; EP 1067351 B1 20050323; ES 2167165 A1 20020501; ES 2167165 B1 20031001; PT 1067351 E 20050729

INPADOC legal status


2012-01-05 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20111116

2011-11-16 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2011-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050323

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070503

2009-08-11 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20071105

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *ROCA CALEFOCCION S.L.AV. DIAGONAL 513, ES-08029 B

- Effective date: 20050323

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *ROCA CALEFOCCION S.L.

- Effective date: 20050323

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ROCA CALEFOCCION S.L.

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070131

2006-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051227

2005-12-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ROCA CALEFACCI N, S.L.

2005-12-14 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROCA CALEFACCI N, S.L.

2005-07-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-06-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050622

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-23 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050523

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-05-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050519

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-04-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2005-04-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2005-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR IT PT

2005-03-23 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-03-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SANCHEZ NAVARRO, ALFREDO

2005-03-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SANCHEZ NAVARRO, ALFREDO

2003-06-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR IT PT

2002-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI