Global patent index - EP 1067353 A1

EP 1067353 A1 2001-01-10 - Firing device for ordnance by percussion of a fuse

Title (en)

Firing device for ordnance by percussion of a fuse

Title (de)

Abfeuerungsvorrichtung für Geschütz durch den Schlag eines Zünders

Title (fr)

Dispositif de mise à feu pour artillerie par percussion d'une étoupille

Publication

EP 1067353 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401872 A

Priority

FR 9908911 A

Abstract (en)

The percussion igniter for an artillery piece has a lever (4) connected to a firing pin (2) and pivoted to support (1). A catch (9) can be released by the lever. A projection arm (11) is fixed to the support to engage the lever. A drive (12) moves the catch to operate the lever and arm the firing pin. The arm has a linkage having notches co-operating with the catch and a heel (17) co-operating with the lever.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a pour objet un dispositif de mise à feu pour artillerie par percussion d'étoupilles à l'aide d'un percuteur 2 mobile en translation par rapport à un support 1, le percuteur 2 étant entraîné en translation par des moyens d'actionnement 4, 9, 11, 12, 18. Les moyens d'actionnement comprennent : un levier 4 relié au percuteur 2 et articulé par rapport au support 1, un cliquet 9 pivotant apte à libérer le levier 4, un moyen de projection 11, 18 agissant sur le levier et solidaire du support 1, des moyens d'entraînement 12 agissant sur le cliquet 9 et provoquant par son intermédiaire la rotation du levier 4 et par suite l'armement du percuteur 2, puis la libération de ce levier 4, et en ce que le moyen d'entraînement en rotation du levier est constitué par une tringle 12 de commande mobile en translation par rapport au support 1, ladite tringle étant munie d'encoches 15, 16 coopérant avec le cliquet 9 d'une part et d'un talon 17 coopérant avec le levier 4 d'autre part. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 19/57; F41A 19/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 19/38 (2006.01); F41A 19/57 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 19/57 (2013.01); F41A 19/38 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FI GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067353 A1 20010110; EP 1067353 B1 20030827; DE 60004740 D1 20031002; DE 60004740 T2 20040325; ES 2206160 T3 20040516; FR 2796140 A1 20010112; FR 2796140 B1 20020823; US 6450080 B1 20020917

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-21 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: NEXTER SYTEMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20160315

2009-07-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090625 AND 20090701

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2206160

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-12-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60004740

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI GB LI SE

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE ES FI GB LI SE

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010123

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FI GB LI SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI