Global Patent Index - EP 1067356 A1

EP 1067356 A1 2001-01-10 - Optical igniter using a graded index glass rod lens

Title (en)

Optical igniter using a graded index glass rod lens

Title (de)

Optischer Zünder mit einem Gradientenindex-Glasstab

Title (fr)

Allumeur optique à barreau en verre à gradient d'indice

Publication

EP 1067356 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00401935 A

Priority

FR 9908717 A

Abstract (en)

The optical ignite for a pyrotechnic has a fibre optic (2). Between the connector (3) and fibre optic is an insulating insert (4). The insert has an orifice (5) aligned with a fibre optic. The orifice has a glass bar (6) with one end of the fibre optic is positioned to project a laser beam through the bar onto the pyrotechnic.

Abstract (fr)

L'allumeur optique comprend une composition pyrotechnique (1) et une fibre optique (2). Entre le connecteur (3) de la fibre optique (2) et la composition pyrotechnique (1) est inséré un élément (4) en une matière peu conductrice thermiquement, comportant un alésage (5) dont l'axe est aligné suivant l'axe de la fibre optique (2) et celui de la composition pyrotechnique (1), cet alésage (5) renfermant un barreau en verre (6) à gradient d'indice dont une extrémité est en contact avec la composition pyrotechnique (1) et l'autre extrémité est en contact avec l'extrémité de la fibre optique (2), de telle sorte que le rayonnement laser issu de ladite extrémité de la fibre optique (2) traverse le barreau en verre (6) et se focalise sur l'extrémité du barreau en verre (6) en contact avec la composition pyrotechnique (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 3/113

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/113 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/113 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067356 A1 20010110; EP 1067356 B1 20040609; DE 60011347 D1 20040715; DE 60011347 T2 20041007; FR 2796166 A1 20010112; FR 2796166 B1 20030530; US 6539868 B1 20030401

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160713

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-05-04 [REG FR CL] CONCESSION TO GRANT LICENCES

2007-03-07 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050310

2004-09-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040825

2004-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60011347 P 20040715

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-06-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030224

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI