Global patent index - EP 1067358 A2

EP 1067358 A2 2001-01-10 - Igniter for a propulsive charge

Title (en)

Igniter for a propulsive charge

Title (de)

Treibladungsanzünder

Title (fr)

Allumeur pour charge propulsive

Publication

EP 1067358 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00121634 A

Priority

  • DE 19631185 A
  • EP 97110971 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0822385A1] The detonator for cartridge ammunition has a detonation tube (4) carrying the primer charge (5). The detonation tube (4) has a tube mantle (8) round the ignition openings (9). A thin-wall shrouding tube (10) protects the charge (5) against ambient conditions, with its outer wall flush against the inner wall of the tube mantle (8) and covers the ignition openings (9). The shrouding tube (10) is of glass, an oxide or glass ceramic, a metal foil or metal alloy, or of plastics produced by differing processes. A plastics inner liner (10) can be produced by rotary casting or blow moulding, using polypropylene (PP), polyethylene (PE), polyethylene terephthalate (PET), polymethylene pentene (PMP), ethylene propylene diene monomer (EPDM) and their co- and ter-polymerisates. Fluor rubber types and thermoplastic elastomers can also be used. The shrouding/inner liner (10) has a wall thickness of 0.1-0.8 mm.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Treibladungsanzünder für patronierte Munition mit einem Anzündrohr (4), in dem sich eine Übertragungsladung (5) befindet, wobei das Anzündrohr (4) ein Anzündöffnungen (9) aufweisendes Mantelrohr (8) und ein zum Schutz der Übertragungsladung (5) gegen äußere Umgebungseinflüsse in dem Mantelrohr (8) angeordnetes dünnwandiges Schutzrohr (10) umfaßt, dessen Außenwand bündig an der Innenwand des Mantelrohres (8) anliegt und die Anzündöffnungen (9) verdeckt. Um zu erreichen, daß auch bei rauher Handhabung sowie bei schockartigen Temperaturänderungen und erhöhter Feuchtelagerung über einen Zeitraum größer > 10 Jahre die Übertragungsladung (5) sicher gegen äußere Umgebungseinflüsse abgedichtet wird, schlägt die Erfindung vor, ein Schutzrohr (10) aus einer Folie aus einem verzehrbaren Metall oder einer verzehrbaren Metallegierung mit einer Wandstärke zwischen 0,1 und 0,8 mm zu verwenden, das innenseitig eng an dem Mantelrohr (8) des Anzündrohres anliegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42C 19/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42C 19/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42C 19/0826 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0822385 A1 19980204; EP 0822385 B1 20011107; AT 208488 T 20011115; AT 225028 T 20021015; AT 226716 T 20021115; DE 19631185 A1 19980205; EP 1039260 A2 20000927; EP 1039260 A3 20001115; EP 1039260 B1 20020925; EP 1067358 A2 20010110; EP 1067358 A3 20010124; EP 1067358 B1 20021023; ES 2165546 T3 20020316; ES 2180491 T3 20030216; US 5895881 A 19990420

INPADOC legal status

2008-06-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2008-03-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-07-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060714

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-10-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-02 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-04-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2002-11-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59708585

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-28

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-10-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 822385

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2002-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES LI NL SE

2002-10-23 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 226716

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020226

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES LI NL SE

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001221

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES LI NL SE

2001-01-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 822385

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES LI NL SE