Global Patent Index - EP 1067473 A1

EP 1067473 A1 2001-01-10 - Integrator

Title (en)

Integrator

Title (de)

Integrator

Title (fr)

Intégrateur

Publication

EP 1067473 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00107682 A

Priority

DE 19931879 A

Abstract (en)

The integrator has a transconductance amplifier (V) whose output is fed back via an integration capacitance (Ci) to its inverting input and with a first reference voltage applied to its non-inverting input. A first current source with a parasitic parallel capacitance has one terminal at reference potential (V2) and another connected via an Ohmic device to a second reference voltage (V1). The Ohmic device is a potential divider with a resistance and another circuit stage, e.g. a switched capacitance or current source, whose junction is connected to the amplifier's inverting input.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Integrator, der den analogen Fotostrom einer Fotodiode (PD) integriert, ist das Verstärkungsbandbreite-produkt wegen der parasitären Parallelkapazität (Cp) der Fotodiode (PD) verhältnismäßig klein. Bei Ausführung mit einer geschalteten Kapazität (C1) muß aber die Bandbreite und gleichzeitig auch die Gleichstromverstärkung groß sein, damit die Integratorfunktion auch bei kleinen Frequenzen gewährleistet ist. Um die beiden sich widersprechenden Forderungen nach großer Bandbreite und hoher Gleichstromverstärkung gleichzeitig zu erfüllen, liegt an einem aus einem Widerstand (R2) und einem hierzu in Reihe geschalteten Schaltungsteil (R1) sowie der Fotodiode (PD) eine Referenzspannung (V1). Der Verbindungspunkt des Spannungsteilers ist mit dem invertierenden Eingang des Transkonduktanzverstärkers (V) verbunden. Bei einem bevorzugten Ausführungsbeispiel ist der der Schaltungsteil (R1) als geschaltete Kapazität (C1) und der Widerstand (R2) als MOS-Transistor (T1) realisiert. Die Erfindung ist als integrierter Schaltkreis besonders für Sigma-Delta-Analog-Umsetzer geeignet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06G 7/186

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06G 7/186 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06G 7/186 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067473 A1 20010110; EP 1067473 B1 20120222; DE 19931879 A1 20010118; US 6501322 B1 20021231

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160502

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161101

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160410

2017-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161230

2016-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160410

2016-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50016206

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-03-21 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50016206

- Effective date: 20121123

2013-01-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20121123

2012-11-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120222

2012-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20120222

2012-06-20 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Effective date: 20120222

2012-04-19 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50016206

- Effective date: 20120419

2012-02-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2012-02-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071011

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-04-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI