Global Patent Index - EP 1067482 A1

EP 1067482 A1 2001-01-10 - Printed image

Title (en)

Printed image

Title (de)

Druckbild

Title (fr)

Image imprimée

Publication

EP 1067482 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00111623 A

Priority

  • DE 19930723 A
  • DE 19931962 A

Abstract (en)

The print image consists of several elements associated with different security stages. The image data of an element can represent alphanumeric or abstract characters or an image element consists of image point matrix displayed in rows and columns. Independent claims are also included for a franking machine, for a memory medium for image data and for an image data record representing text, graphics and/or graphics with text.

Abstract (de)

Es ist bekannt, mit einer Frankiermaschine ein Druckbild, bestehend aus mehreren Elementen oder Teilen, auf ein Poststück zu drucken. Ein solches Druckbild besteht beispielsweise regelmäßig aus einem Portostempelbild, einem Datumstempelbild und einem Werbebild, wie in Fig. 8 gezeigt ist. Es ist auch bekannt, Druckbilddaten bzw. Druckteilbilddaten mittels einer Chipkarte in die Frankiermaschine einzugeben. Diese Daten von den Chipkarten werden in einen Speicher der Frankiermaschine übertragen, so daß der Mikroprozessor sich die für den Druck benötigten Teilbilddaten zusammenstellen kann. Es ist Aufgabe der vorliegenden Erfindung, die beschriebenen Nachteile zu vermeiden, damit ein Bild, insbesondere ein Druckbild, erzeugt werden kann, welches eine maximale Sicherheit und maximale mögliche Flexibilität zur individuellen Anpassung gewährleistet. Bild, insbesondere Druckbild, bestehend aus mehreren Elementen, denen unterschiedliche Sicherheitsstufen zugeordnet sind. Speichermedium, insbesondere für eine Frankiereinrichtung nach einem der vorhergehenden Ansprüche, wobei im Speichermedium Bilddaten eines Bildelementes zusammen mit den Daten der zugeordneten Sicherheitsstufe gespeichert sind, daß mehreren Bildelementen, die in dem Speichermedium gespeichert sind, die gleiche oder unterschiedliche Sicherheitsstufen zugeordnet sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00362 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00177 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00298 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00403 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00572 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067482 A1 20010110; EP 1067482 B1 20121114; CN 1150093 C 20040519; CN 1290604 A 20010411; US 6698953 B1 20040302

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: GARTENSTRASSE 28 A, 5400 BADEN (CH)

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160316

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160519

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, 16547 BIRKENWERDER, DE

- Document: DE 50016275

- Effective date: 20150330

2015-05-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG, 16547 BIRKENWERDER, DE

- Document: DE 50016275

- Effective date: 20121031

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50016275

- Representative's name: EISENFUEHR SPEISER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAEL, DE

- Effective date: 20150330

2015-03-30 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50016275

- Representative's name: EISENFUEHR SPEISER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAEL, DE

2013-12-12 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 50016275

- Effective date: 20130815

2013-12-05 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50016275

- Effective date: 20131011

2013-11-20 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20131025

2013-10-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130815

2013-10-11 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 50016275

2013-01-10 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 50016275

- Effective date: 20130110

2012-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2012-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG, CH

2012-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2012-11-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2012-11-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HERTLEIN, JENS, DR.

2005-11-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010710

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI