Global Patent Index - EP 1067483 A3

EP 1067483 A3 2001-05-16 - Method and system for providing information to machine users

Title (en)

Method and system for providing information to machine users

Title (de)

Verfahren und System zur Lieferung von Informationen an Benutzern von Geräte

Title (fr)

Procédé et système fournissant des informations à des usagers de machines

Publication

EP 1067483 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 00305817 A

Priority

GB 9916242 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1067483A2] A postage metering system is described in which during a transaction between postage metering apparatus and a remote data centre for example for the purpose of refunding a value of credit in the postage metering apparatus, the remote data centre transmits to the postage metering apparatus a message that is unrelated to the transaction. The data centre may transmit a message selected for a specific postage metering apparatus by storing a plurality of messages and selecting a message from the plurality of messages in dependence upon a profile of the postage metering apparatus or of a user thereof that is determined by an identification of the postage metering apparatus. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/0008 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00161 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00298 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067483 A2 20010110; EP 1067483 A3 20010516; EP 1067483 B1 20100908; DE 60044926 D1 20101021; GB 9916242 D0 19990915

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-07-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110731

2012-02-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-10-13 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 60044926

- Effective date: 20110609

2011-08-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110609

2010-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60044926 P 20101021

2010-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2010-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2010-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-11-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061025

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB LI

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011112

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI