Global Patent Index - EP 1067485 A1

EP 1067485 A1 2001-01-10 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR VALIDATING AND CHARACTERIZING COINS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR VALIDATING AND CHARACTERIZING COINS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM PRÜFEN UND KENNZEICHNEN VON MÜNZEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR LA VALIDATION ET LA CARACTERISATION DES PIECES DE MONNAIE

Publication

EP 1067485 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99961074 A

Priority

  • ES 9900400 W
  • ES 9900141 A

Abstract (en)

Method and apparatus for coin validation and characterisation, comprising partial illumination of the edge of coin (1) by a collimated beam of light (6) with a rectangular cross-section, which reaches the edge of the coin along a band parallel to the axis of said coin, of a width equal to or smaller than the thickness of the alterations which are to be detected. A sensor (9) for analysing the reflected light is placed so that it receives only the diffuse reflection (11) caused by the relief or surface alterations of the coin edge, but does not receive specular reflection (12) caused by the smooth areas of said edge. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07D 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07D 5/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0043961A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067485 A1 20010110; EP 1067485 B1 20100505; AR 022184 A1 20020904; AU 1781300 A 20000807; DE 69942337 D1 20100617; ES 2152175 A1 20010116; ES 2152175 B1 20010701; ES 2345966 T3 20101006; PE 12622000 A1 20001211; WO 0043961 A1 20000727; ZA 200000152 B 20000927

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111229

2013-07-03 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130703

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101228

2011-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-11-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69942337

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110701

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110103

2011-09-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110831

2011-08-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20101228

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101006

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-05-26 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 69942337

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110207

2011-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20110208

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100505

2010-10-06 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2345966

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2010-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69942337

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2010-06-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2010-05-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2010-05-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000925

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE