Global Patent Index - EP 1067496 A2

EP 1067496 A2 2001-01-10 - Security device and method for detecting the unauthorized opening of containers

Title (en)

Security device and method for detecting the unauthorized opening of containers

Title (de)

Sicherheitsvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Detektierung des unbefugten Öffnens von Behältern

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité et procédé pour détecter l'ouverture non autorisée des récipients

Publication

EP 1067496 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00305812 A

Priority

US 34977599 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a security device (10) and a system and method based on light detection for detecting the unauthorized opening of containers (computer cases, luggage, filing cabinets, shipping containers, etc.). The security device (10) is mounted inside the container for signalling whether the aperture is opened and includes the following: a power source (12) such as a battery that is independent of any power supply in the container; a light sensor (14) (such as a photo transistor) to detect light entering the container; a controller (18) powered by the power source (12) and connected to the light sensor (14); a warning system (16) (such as an audible alarm system) activated by the controller (18), the controller activating the warning system when the light sensor (14) detects light that exceeds a first predetermined threshold indicating that the container has been breached; and a locking mechanism (128) (key lock, combination lock, infra-red based lock) for enabling and disabling the security device. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 21/86 (2013.01); G06F 21/88 (2013.01); G08B 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 21/86 (2013.01); G06F 21/88 (2013.01); G08B 13/1409 (2013.01); G08B 13/1481 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1067496 A2 20010110; EP 1067496 A3 20011121; CA 2313652 A1 20010109

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-09-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-08-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 08B 13/14 A, 7G 06F 1/00 B

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI